EP2968360 - QUINOLINONE DERIVATIVES FOR THE INHIBITION OF BROMODOMAIN-CONTAINING PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/03] | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR INHIBITION OF BROMODOMAIN-CONTAINING PROTEINS | ||
[2020/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.07.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ConverGene LLC 22 Firstfield Road Suite 280 Gaithersburg, Maryland 20878 / US | [2016/07] |
Former [2016/03] | For all designated states ConverGene LLC 22 Firstfield Road Suite 280 Gaithersburg, Maryland 20878 / US | ||
For all designated states Vankayalapati, Hariprasad 11558 South Sugar Berry Road Draper, Utah 84020 / US | |||
For all designated states Yoshioka, Makoto 18510 Boysenberry Road Apt. 192 Gaithersburg, Maryland 20879 / US | |||
For all designated states Strovel, Jeffrey William 8580 Light Moon Way Laurel, Maryland 20723 / US | |||
For all designated states Padia, Janak Khimchand 13628 Monarch Vista Drive Germantown, Maryland 20874 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VANKAYALAPATI, Hariprasad 11558 South Sugar Berry Road Draper, Utah 84020 / US | 02 /
YOSHIOKA, Makoto 18510 Boysenberry Road Apt. 192 Gaithersburg, Maryland 20879 / US | 03 /
STROVEL, Jeffrey William 8580 Light Moon Way Laurel, Maryland 20723 / US | 04 /
PADIA, Janak Khimchand 13628 Monarch Vista Drive Germantown, Maryland 20874 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Schiweck Weinzierl Koch Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Ganghoferstraße 68 B 80339 München / DE | [2021/03] |
Former [2016/03] | Schiweck, Weinzierl & Koch European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Straße 98 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14776141.5 | 13.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US25289 | Priority number, date | US201361781988P | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361781988 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014159837 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2968360 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2968360 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07D413/04, C07D413/14, C07D471/04, C07D487/04, C07C233/15, C07D261/08, A61K31/5517, A61K31/4745, A61K31/4709, A61P35/00, A61P19/02, A61P25/28, A61P31/18 | [2016/30] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
C07C217/84 (EP,US);
C07D215/22 (EP,US);
C07D215/227 (EP,US);
C07D215/38 (EP,US);
C07D261/08 (EP,US);
C07D265/22 (EP,US);
C07D265/26 (EP,US);
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D405/04 (EP,US);
C07D405/06 (EP,US);
C07D409/06 (EP,US);
C07D409/14 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/03] | A61K31/5517, A61K31/4738, A61K31/47, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHINOLINON-DERIVATE ZUR HEMMUNG VON BROMDOMÄNENHALTIGEN PROTEINEN | [2020/32] | English: | QUINOLINONE DERIVATIVES FOR THE INHIBITION OF BROMODOMAIN-CONTAINING PROTEINS | [2020/32] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE QUINOLINONE POUR L'INHIBITION DE PROTÉINES CONTENANT UN BROMODOMAINE | [2020/32] |
Former [2016/03] | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR HEMMUNG VON BROMDOMÄNENHALTIGEN PROTEINEN | ||
Former [2016/03] | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR INHIBITION OF BROMODOMAIN-CONTAINING PROTEINS | ||
Former [2016/03] | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS POUR L'INHIBITION DE PROTÉINES CONTENANT UN BROMODOMAINE | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 14.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 05.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.02.2018 | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.03.2014 | AL | 20.01.2021 | AT | 20.01.2021 | CY | 20.01.2021 | CZ | 20.01.2021 | DK | 20.01.2021 | EE | 20.01.2021 | ES | 20.01.2021 | FI | 20.01.2021 | HR | 20.01.2021 | IT | 20.01.2021 | LT | 20.01.2021 | LV | 20.01.2021 | MC | 20.01.2021 | MK | 20.01.2021 | MT | 20.01.2021 | NL | 20.01.2021 | PL | 20.01.2021 | RO | 20.01.2021 | RS | 20.01.2021 | SE | 20.01.2021 | SI | 20.01.2021 | SK | 20.01.2021 | SM | 20.01.2021 | IE | 13.03.2021 | LU | 13.03.2021 | FR | 20.03.2021 | BE | 31.03.2021 | CH | 31.03.2021 | LI | 31.03.2021 | BG | 20.04.2021 | GB | 20.04.2021 | NO | 20.04.2021 | GR | 21.04.2021 | IS | 20.05.2021 | PT | 20.05.2021 | DE | 01.10.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 13.03.2014 | |
AL | 20.01.2021 | ||
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CY | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
IT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
MK | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
IE | 13.03.2021 | ||
LU | 13.03.2021 | ||
FR | 20.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
GB | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
DE | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 13.03.2014 | |
AL | 20.01.2021 | ||
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CY | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
IT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
IE | 13.03.2021 | ||
LU | 13.03.2021 | ||
FR | 20.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
GB | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
DE | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 13.03.2014 | |
AL | 20.01.2021 | ||
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
IT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
IE | 13.03.2021 | ||
LU | 13.03.2021 | ||
FR | 20.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
GB | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
DE | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
IT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
IE | 13.03.2021 | ||
LU | 13.03.2021 | ||
FR | 20.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
GB | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
DE | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
IT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
IE | 13.03.2021 | ||
LU | 13.03.2021 | ||
FR | 20.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
GB | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
DE | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
IE | 13.03.2021 | ||
LU | 13.03.2021 | ||
FR | 20.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
GB | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
DE | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
IE | 13.03.2021 | ||
LU | 13.03.2021 | ||
FR | 20.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
GB | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
DE | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
IE | 13.03.2021 | ||
LU | 13.03.2021 | ||
FR | 20.03.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
GB | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
DE | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
IE | 13.03.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
DE | 01.10.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 20.01.2021 | |
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 20.01.2021 | |
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | FI | 20.01.2021 | |
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 20.01.2021 | |
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1369627 (GEIGY AG J R) [X] 1,6,11-13,15 * the whole document; in particular, page 3, example 1, the first two compounds of the penultimate paragraph *; | [X]WO03106452 (MILLENNIUM PHARM INC [US], et al) [X] 1,6,11 * the whole document; in particular, pages 46-47, compounds V-17, V-18, and V-28 *; | [X]WO2007109251 (AVANIR PHARMACEUTICALS [US], et al) [X] 1,6 * page 100; compound 133 *; | [I]WO2011054844 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC [US], et al) [I] 1-3,11-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2011054846 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-3,11-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2011054848 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC [US], et al) [A] 1,6,7,11-15* the whole document *; | [A] - JONATHAN SEAL ET AL, "Identification of a novel series of BET family bromodomain inhibitors: Binding mode and profile of I-BET151 (GSK1210151A)", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (20120401), vol. 22, no. 8, doi:10.1016/j.bmcl.2012.02.041, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 2968 - 2972, XP055062908 [A] 1-3,11-15 * the whole document; in particular, page 2969, table 1, compound 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2012.02.041 | [X] - UKRAINETS I V ET AL, "4-Hydroxy-2-quinolones. 92. Reaction of 1-R-4-chloro-3-ethoxycarbonyl-2-oxo-1,2-dihydroquinolines with anilines", CHEMISTRY OF HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS-PLENUM PUBLISHERS, NL, (20060301), vol. 42, no. 3, doi:10.1007/S10593-006-0091-5, ISSN 1573-8353, pages 343 - 351, XP019393559 [X] 1,6 * page 344; compounds 3e - 3k * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10593-006-0091-5 | [X] - S ANDREAE ET AL, "Electrophile Aminierung von C-H-aciden Verbindungen mit l-Oxa-2-azaspiro[ 2.51 octan", EUROPEAN JOOURNAL OF EUROPEAN CHEMISTRY, (19920312), vol. 1992, no. 3, doi:10.1002/jlac.199219920143, pages 239 - 256, XP055306284 [X] 10 * page 243; compound 35c * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jlac.199219920143 | International search | [A]US2010286127 (MIYOSHI SHINJI [JP], et al); | [A]US2012157428 (ALBRECHT BRIAN K [US], et al); | [A]US2012220573 (GOSMINI ROMAIN LUC MARIE [FR], et al); | [A]US2012252781 (BAILEY JAMES [GB], et al); | [A]WO2013027168 (PFIZER [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2011054848 | - Cell, (19920207), vol. 68, no. 3, pages 561 - 72 | - J Biomol Screen., (20111200), vol. 16, no. 10, pages 1170 - 85 | - Bioinformatics, (20040612), vol. 20, no. 9, pages 1416 - 27 | - Med Chem Commun., (20120104), vol. 3, no. 2, pages 123 - 134 | - Curr Opin Drug Discov Devel., (20090900), vol. 12, no. 5, pages 659 - 65 | - Discov Med., (20101200), vol. 10, no. 55, pages 489 - 99 | - FEBS Lett., (20100804), vol. 584, no. 15, pages 3260 - 8 | - J Virol., (20060900), vol. 80, no. 18, pages 8909 - 19 | - J Virol., (20050700), vol. 79, no. 14, pages 8920 - 32 | - Curr Opin Pharmacol., (20080200), vol. 8, no. 1, pages 57 - 64 | - Front Biosci., (20010801), vol. 6, pages D1008 - 18 | - J Biol Chem., (20070504), vol. 282, no. 18, pages 13141 - 5 | - Nature, (20101223), vol. 468, no. 7327, pages 1067 - 73 | - Cell, (20110916), vol. 146, no. 6, pages 904 - 1 | - Proc Natl Acad Sci U S A., (20111004), vol. 108, no. 40, pages 16669 - 74 | - Proc Natl Acad Sci USA., (20111004), vol. 108, no. 40, pages 16669 - 74 | - Cancer Discov., (20130300), vol. 3, no. 3, pages 308 - 23 |