EP2971035 - RECOMBINANT POLYPEPTIDE PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MedImmune, LLC One MedImmune Way Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STREICHER, Katie c/o Medlmmune LLC One Medlmmune Way Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | 02 /
JACOBS, Jonathan c/o Medlmmune LLC One Medlmmune Way Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | 03 /
GEORGANTAS III, Robert, W. c/o Medlmmune LLC One Medlmmune Way Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | 04 /
GREENLEES, Lydia c/o Medlmmune LLC One Medlmmune Way Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | 05 /
RANADE, Koustubh c/o Medlmmune LLC One Medlmmune Way Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | 06 /
BOWEN, Michael c/o Medlmmune LLC One Medlmmune Way Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | AstraZeneca Intellectual Property Eastbrook House Shaftesbury Road Cambridge CB2 8BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/24] | AstraZeneca Milstein Building Granta Park Cambridge CB21 6GH / GB | ||
Former [2016/03] | Ttofi, Evangelia MedImmune Limited Milstein Building Granta Park Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB21 6GH / GB | Application number, filing date | 14776495.5 | 12.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US24512 | Priority number, date | US201361782180P | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361782180 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014159633 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2971035 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2971035 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113, C12N15/67, C12N15/85, C12N5/16, C12P21/02 | [2016/45] | CPC: |
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
C07K14/705 (US);
C07K16/00 (EP,US);
C07K16/4208 (US);
C12N9/00 (US);
C12P21/02 (EP,US);
C07K2317/14 (EP,US);
C07K2317/21 (US);
C07K2317/22 (US);
C07K2317/24 (US);
C07K2317/31 (US);
C07K2317/40 (US);
C07K2317/565 (US);
C07K2317/622 (US);
C12N2310/113 (EP,US);
C12N2330/50 (EP,US);
C12N2501/65 (EP,US);
C12N2799/027 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/178 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/03] | C12P19/34, C12P21/06, C12N5/07, C12N5/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON REKOMBINANTEN POLYPEPTIDEN | [2016/03] | English: | RECOMBINANT POLYPEPTIDE PRODUCTION | [2016/03] | French: | PRODUCTION DE POLYPEPTIDE RECOMBINÉ | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 13.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 28.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.05.2017 | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.03.2014 | AL | 12.06.2019 | AT | 12.06.2019 | CY | 12.06.2019 | CZ | 12.06.2019 | DK | 12.06.2019 | EE | 12.06.2019 | FI | 12.06.2019 | HR | 12.06.2019 | LT | 12.06.2019 | LV | 12.06.2019 | MC | 12.06.2019 | MK | 12.06.2019 | MT | 12.06.2019 | PL | 12.06.2019 | RO | 12.06.2019 | RS | 12.06.2019 | SI | 12.06.2019 | SK | 12.06.2019 | SM | 12.06.2019 | TR | 12.06.2019 | BG | 12.09.2019 | NO | 12.09.2019 | GR | 13.09.2019 | IS | 12.10.2019 | PT | 14.10.2019 | IE | 12.03.2020 | LU | 12.03.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 12.03.2014 | |
AL | 12.06.2019 | ||
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CY | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
MT | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IE | 12.03.2020 | ||
LU | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IE | 12.03.2020 | ||
LU | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
LU | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 12.06.2019 | |
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2008015662 (UNIV DUBLIN CITY [IE], et al) [Y] 1-17 * claim 1; table 1 *; | [I] - Noëlia Sanchez, "miRNAs as tools to improve CHO cell bioprocess phenotypes", Ph. D. thesis, Dublin, Ireland, (201301), pages i-xi,1 - 474, URL: http://doras.dcu.ie/17716/1/Final_bound_thesis_NSanchez.pdf, (20160919), XP055303658 [I] 1-17 * page 111 - page 128 * * page 337 - page 338 * | [Y] - ALIAKSANDR DRUZ ET AL, "Stable inhibition of mmu-miR-466h-5p improves apoptosis resistance and protein production in CHO cells", METABOLIC ENGINEERING, US, (20130129), vol. 16, doi:10.1016/j.ymben.2012.12.004, ISSN 1096-7176, pages 87 - 94, XP055303725 [Y] 1-17 * figures 2,6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymben.2012.12.004 | [Y] - MULLER D ET AL, "MicroRNAs as targets for engineering of CHO cell factories", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER PUBLICATIONS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, vol. 26, no. 7, doi:10.1016/J.TIBTECH.2008.03.010, ISSN 0167-7799, (20080528), pages 359 - 365, (20080528), XP022757292 [Y] 1-17 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tibtech.2008.03.010 | [X] - WING PUI TSANG ET AL, "Let-7a microRNA suppresses therapeutics-induced cancer cell death by targeting caspase-3", APOPTOSIS ; AN INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL ON PROGRAMMED CELL DEATH, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO, (20080829), vol. 13, no. 10, ISSN 1573-675X, pages 1215 - 1222, XP019599278 [X] 17 * page 1216; figures 2,4 * | [X] - ROBERTSON BARBARA ET AL, "Specificity and functionality of microRNA inhibitors", SILENCE, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD, LONDON, UK, (20100401), vol. 1, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1758-907X-1-10, ISSN 1758-907X, page 10, XP021084868 [X] 17 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1758-907X-1-10 | [A] - ROUSH S ET AL, "The let-7 family of microRNAs", TRENDS IN CELL BIOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE LTD, XX, vol. 18, no. 10, doi:10.1016/J.TCB.2008.07.007, ISSN 0962-8924, (20080904), pages 505 - 516, (20080904), XP025468977 [A] 1-17 * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tcb.2008.07.007 | [Y] - NIALL BARRON ET AL, "MicroRNAs: tiny targets for engineering CHO cell phenotypes?", BIOTECHNOLOGY LETTERS, SPRINGER NETHERLANDS, DORDRECHT, (20100925), vol. 33, no. 1, doi:10.1007/S10529-010-0415-5, ISSN 1573-6776, pages 11 - 21, XP019869481 [Y] 1-17 * table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10529-010-0415-5 | [A] - JUAN A. HERNÁNDEZ BORT ET AL, "Dynamic mRNA and miRNA profiling of CHO-K1 suspension cell cultures", BIOTECHNOLOGY JOURNAL, (20110805), vol. 7, no. 4, doi:10.1002/biot.201100143, ISSN 1860-6768, pages 500 - 515, XP055094799 [A] 1-17 * figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/biot.201100143 | [A] - VAIBHAV JADHAV ET AL, "A screening method to assess biological effects of microRNA overexpression in Chinese hamster ovary cells", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (20120322), vol. 109, no. 6, doi:10.1002/bit.24490, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 1376 - 1385, XP055094798 [A] 1-17 * figures 3,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.24490 | [YP] - VAIBHAV JADHAV ET AL, "CHO microRNA engineering is growing up: Recent successes and future challenges", BIOTECHNOLOGY ADVANCES, (20130802), vol. 31, no. 8, doi:10.1016/j.biotechadv.2013.07.007, ISSN 0734-9750, pages 1501 - 1513, XP055094976 [YP] 1-17 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biotechadv.2013.07.007 | [T] - LYDIA GREENLEES ET AL, "Inhibition of microRNA-let-7a Increases the Specific Productivity of Antibody-Producing CHO Cell Lines", GENOMICS AND APPLIED BIOLOGY, (20140726), vol. 5, no. 1, doi:10.5376/gab.2014.05.0001, pages 1 - 15, XP055303694 [T] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5376/gab.2014.05.0001 | International search | [Y]US2009035862 (CALOS MICHELE P [US]); | [Y]US2010190256 (RAWSON NANCY ELLEN [US], et al); | [Y]US2010226884 (CHANG CHIEN-HSING [US], et al); | [Y]US2010267573 (KEENE JACK D [US], et al); | [X]WO2010129919 (RES DEV FOUNDATION [US], et al); | [Y]US2011098346 (WANG SHU [SG], et al); | [Y]US2011189137 (RANA TARIQ M [US]); | [Y]US2011224286 (YU XIJIE [US], et al); | [Y]US2012230959 (ABBOT STEWART [US], et al); | [A] - KHODAYARI, N. ET AL., "EphrinA1 inhibits Malignant Mesothelioma Tumor Growth Via let-7 microRNA-Mediated Repression Of The RAS Oncogene .", CANCER GENE THERAPY., (20110826), vol. 18, pages 806 - 816, XP055279296 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/cgt.2011.50 | Examination | - KIRANMAI GUMIREDDY ET AL, "Small-Molecule Inhibitors of MicroRNA miR-21 Function", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION, (20080915), vol. 47, no. 39, doi:10.1002/anie.200801555, ISSN 1433-7851, pages 7482 - 7484, XP055198586 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.200801555 |