EP2979776 - SAND-MOLD MOLDING METHOD AND SAND-MOLD MOLDING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.10.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sintokogio, Ltd. 11-11, Nishiki 1-chome Naka-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 460-0003 / JP | [2016/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAEGAWA, Takumi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
WATANABE, Hirotsune c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
SUDA, Tomokazu c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 04 /
MITSUTAKE, Masaomi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 05 /
KANNO, Toshio c/o Sintokogio, Ltd. Toyokawa-Seisakusho 1 Honohara 3-chome Toyokawa-shi Aichi 442-8505 / JP | 06 /
KURITA, Hirotaka c/o Sintokogio, Ltd. Toyokawa-Seisakusho 1 Honohara 3-chome Toyokawa-shi Aichi 442-8505 / JP | [2016/05] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/05] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14776559.8 | 22.01.2014 | [2016/05] | WO2014JP51273 | Priority number, date | JP20130066335 | 27.03.2013 Original published format: JP 2013066335 | [2016/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014156246 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2979776 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B22C9/02 | [2016/05] | CPC: |
B22C7/065 (EP,US);
B22C15/08 (EP,US);
B22C19/00 (EP,US);
B22C9/02 (EP,US);
B22C9/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/05] | Title | German: | FORMVERFAHREN FÜR SANDFORM UND FORMVORRICHTUNG FÜR SANDFORM | [2016/05] | English: | SAND-MOLD MOLDING METHOD AND SAND-MOLD MOLDING APPARATUS | [2016/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MOULAGE DE MOULE EN SABLE ET APPAREIL DE MOULAGE DE MOULE EN SABLE | [2016/05] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2015 | Translation filed | 08.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2015 | Search fee paid | 08.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/05] | 09.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/45] | 20.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0056112 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * page 21, lines 5-10 * * page 34, lines 7-24; figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]JP2000190049 (SINTOKOGIO LTD) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0005]; figure 1 *; | [A]JP2002137044 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-6* abstract *; | [A]JP2011173157 (LIGNYTE CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH10263745 (NORITAKE CO LTD); | [A]JP2007522947 (HORMEL FOODS, LLC) | by applicant | JP2002192305 |