Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3047555
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
03.08.2018 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] |
25.04.2018 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
07.11.2017 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
25.11.2016 |
Change - extension states |
published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] |
22.11.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.09.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.06.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.07.2016 [2016/30] |
24.06.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.07.2016 [2016/30] |
23.05.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.04.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.04.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.04.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
06.04.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.03.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.11.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.03.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.03.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.10.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|