EP3047555 - AUTONOMOUS VOLTAGE LOAD CONTROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Danmarks Tekniske Universitet Anker Engelunds Vej 101 A 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [2016/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOUGLASS, Philip James Rentemestervej 5 1.th. DK-2400 Copenhagen NV / DK | 02 /
VALLE, Rodrigo Garcia Jægersborg Allé 233 1 tv. DK-2820 Gentofte / DK | 03 /
TUDORA, Octavian Constantin c/o M.M. Gunnargaard Vester Søgade 68 2.tv. DK-1601 Copenhagen V / DK | [2016/30] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2016/30] | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Rued Langgaards Vej 8 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | Application number, filing date | 14776993.9 | 18.09.2014 | [2016/30] | WO2014DK50291 | Priority number, date | EP20130184885 | 18.09.2013 Original published format: EP 13184885 | [2016/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015039668 | Date: | 26.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3047555 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/14 | [2016/30] | CPC: |
H02J3/14 (EP,US);
H02J2310/12 (EP);
Y02B70/3225 (EP,US);
Y04S20/222 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/30] | Title | German: | AUTONOME SPANNUNGSLASTSTEUERUNG | [2016/30] | English: | AUTONOMOUS VOLTAGE LOAD CONTROLLER | [2016/30] | French: | CONTRÔLEUR DE CHARGE DE TENSION AUTONOME | [2016/30] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/30] | 21.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/36] | 26.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4847897 (MEANS DONALD R [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US4851782 (JEERINGS DONALD I [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US5487956 (BROMLEY STEVEN D [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2010092823 (TAMURA SEISAKUSHO KK) [A] 1-12* the whole document * |