EP3021784 - CONNECTION DEVICE FOR DENTAL IMPLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2022 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dental Knowledge S.r.l. Largo Augusto, 1 20122 Milano / IT | [2021/30] |
Former [2016/21] | For all designated states Dental Knowledge S.r.l. Via Modestino 3 20144 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERTAGNON, Valter Largo Augusto, 1 I-20122 Milano / IT | [2021/30] |
Former [2016/21] | 01 /
BERTAGNON, Valter c/o DENTAL KNOWLEDGE S.r.l. Via Modestino 3 I-20144 Milano / IT | Representative(s) | Long, Giorgio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | [2016/21] | Application number, filing date | 14777152.1 | 09.07.2014 | [2016/21] | WO2014IB62971 | Priority number, date | IT2013MI01162 | 10.07.2013 Original published format: IT MI20131162 | [2016/21] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015004614 | Date: | 15.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3021784 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3021784 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61C8/00 | [2016/21] | CPC: |
A61C8/0095 (EP,US);
A61C13/0019 (US);
A61C8/0001 (EP,US);
A61C8/005 (EP,US);
A61C8/0068 (US);
A61C9/004 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR ZAHNIMPLANTATE | [2016/21] | English: | CONNECTION DEVICE FOR DENTAL IMPLANTS | [2016/21] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE CONNEXION POUR IMPLANTS DENTAIRES | [2016/21] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/21] | 19.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.05.2021 | MK | 12.05.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/30] | CY | 12.05.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO9701306 (BEATY KEITH D [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,9,10 * figures 9, 10 * * page 10, line 3 - page 11, line 24 *[I] 8; | [X]EP0823243 (G C DENTAL IND CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,6,8-10 * figures 1, 2, 4, 9-11, 13 * * column 10, line 11 - column 12, line 42 *; | [X]US2008008981 (GROLL WERNER [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,10 * figures 2-8 * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0059] *; | [XI]WO2010088754 (BIOCAD MEDICAL INC [CA], et al) [X] 1,6,8,10 * figures 1-11 * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0054] * [I] 9 | Examination | US5116225 |