EP2972567 - MULTI-CARRIER PROCESSING IN AUDITORY PROSTHETIC DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ohio State Innovation Foundation 1524 North High Street Columbus, OH 43201 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
APOUX, Frederic Christian 1139 Wimbeldon Boulevard Columbus, Ohio 43228 / US | 02 /
HEALY, Eric William 7815 Brandonway Drive Dublin, Ohio 43017 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Bingham, Ian Mark The IP Asset Partnership Limited Prama House 267 Banbury Road Oxford OX2 7HT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Creek, Isobel Clare IP Asset LLP Prama House 267 Banbury Road Oxford OX2 7HT / GB | Application number, filing date | 14778588.5 | 11.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US23543 | Priority number, date | US201361776281P | 11.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361776281 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014164814 | Date: | 09.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2972567 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G02C11/06, G10L21/16, H04R25/02, A61N1/05, G10L21/0364, A61N1/36 | [2016/49] | CPC: |
A61N1/0541 (EP,US);
A61N1/36038 (EP,US);
A61N1/36139 (EP,US);
A61N1/36192 (EP,US);
G10L21/0364 (EP,US);
H04R1/1083 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/03] | G02C11/06, G10L21/16, H04R25/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | MEHRTRÄGERVERARBEITUNG IN HÖRPROTHESENVORRICHTUNGEN | [2016/03] | English: | MULTI-CARRIER PROCESSING IN AUDITORY PROSTHETIC DEVICES | [2016/03] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT MULTIPORTEUSES DANS DES DISPOSITIFS PROTHÉTIQUES AUDITIFS | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 08.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 25.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/52] | 22.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.03.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2010051857 (OTICON AS [DK], et al) [X] 1,2,5-15 * figures 2-4,7 * * page 1, lines 18-29 * * page 2, lines 8-22 * * page 3, lines 9-20 * * page 4, lines 32-36 * * page 7, lines 14-16 * * page 11, lines 14-16 * * page 12, line 17 * * page 16, line 30 * * page 19, line 32 - page 20, line 7 * * page 22, line 22 - page 27, line 3 * [I] 3,4 | International search | [X]US4357497 (HOCHMAIR INGEBORG J, et al); | [Y]US2012239385 (HERSBACH ADAM A [AU], et al); | [Y]WO2011100802 (BIONIC EAR INST [AU], et al); | [Y]WO2010057267 (UNIV QUEENSLAND [AU], et al); | [Y]US2009312820 (NIE KAIBAO [US], et al); | [Y]US2013023967 (STAFFORD RYAN C [US], et al) | [Y] - GALVIN III, J ET AL., "Effects of Stimulation Rate, Mode and Level on Modulation Detection by Chochlear Implant Users", JOURNAL OF THE ASSOCIATION FOR RESEARCH IN OTOLARYNGOLOGY;, (20050802), pages 269 - 279, URL: http://link.springer.com/article/10.1007%2Fs10162-005-0007-6/fulltext.html, (20140702), XP019368250 |