Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9378426 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2016 | B2 | US2015262023 | 17.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514724358 | 28.05.2015 | US201361807516 | 02.04.2013 | US201414231072 | 31.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9070036 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2015 | B2 | US2014294236 | 02.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361807516 | 02.04.2013 | US201414231072 | 31.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101650833B | Global Dossier | 24.08.2016 | B1 | KR20150126723 | 12.11.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US32382 | 31.03.2014 | US201361807516 | 02.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6159015B | Global Dossier | 05.07.2017 | B2 | JP2016525729 | 25.08.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US32382 | 31.03.2014 | US201361807516 | 02.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105144198B | Global Dossier | 14.09.2021 | B | CN105144198 | 09.12.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US32382 | 31.03.2014 | US201361807516 | 02.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2981932 | Global Dossier | 14.11.2018 | B1 | EP2981932 | 11.01.2017 | A4 | EP2981932 | 10.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US32382 | 31.03.2014 | US201361807516 | 02.04.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014165445 | Global Dossier | 09.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361807516 | 02.04.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI620078B | 01.04.2018 | B | TW201445337 | 01.12.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361807516 | 02.04.2013 |