EP2974420 - TECHNIQUES FOR AUTHENTICATING A DEVICE FOR WIRELESS DOCKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2020 [2020/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEVY, Elad Dafna 9 74068 Nes Ziona / IL | 02 /
GLIK, Michael Har Rotem 24 44539 Kfar Saba / IL | 03 /
PENTELKA, Paz Kiriat Hasharon 42655 Natania / IL | 04 /
KAHANA, Yaron 11 HaEgoz 44288 Kfar Saba / IL | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | HGF Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Somerville, Andrew Edward HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 14780011.4 | 11.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US22970 | Priority number, date | US201313794656 | 11.03.2013 Original published format: US201313794656 | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014164603 | Date: | 09.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2974420 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/06, H04W12/04, H04L29/06, H04L29/08, H04L9/08 | [2019/17] | CPC: |
H04L63/0876 (EP,RU,US);
H04L63/06 (RU,US);
H04L63/08 (RU,US);
H04L67/104 (RU,US);
H04L9/0838 (RU,US);
H04W12/06 (RU);
|
Former IPC [2016/03] | H04W12/06, H04W12/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG EINER VORRICHTUNG FÜR DRAHTLOSES ANDOCKEN | [2016/03] | English: | TECHNIQUES FOR AUTHENTICATING A DEVICE FOR WIRELESS DOCKING | [2016/03] | French: | TECHNIQUES SERVANT À AUTHENTIFIER UN DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE SE RELIER SANS FIL | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2015 | Search fee paid | 11.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 02.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/06] | 19.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.04.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007280169 (CAM WINGET NANCY [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0013] * * figures 2, 3 *; | [X]US2009086973 (BUDDHIKOT MILIND MADHAV [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0087] * * figures 6A, 6B * | International search | [Y]US2009086973 (BUDDHIKOT MILIND MADHAV [US], et al); | [Y]US2009169011 (ZHAO MEIYUAN [US], et al); | [A]US2008311906 (SUH KYUNG-JOO [KR], et al); | [A]KR20080067078 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) | by applicant | US2007280169 |