EP2982197 - PAGING REPETITION FOR INCREASED ROBUSTNESS FOR EXTENDED PAGING CYCLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, IT | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2020/52] |
Former [2016/06] | For all designated states Intel IP Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VANNITHAMBY, Rath 13470 NW Alvada Street Portland, OR 97229 / US | 02 /
JHA, Satish, C. 2111 NE 25th Avenue Mailstop JF3-206 Hillsboro, OR 97124 / US | 03 /
KOC, Ali, Taha 17869 NW Deerfield Drive Portland, OR 97229 / US | 04 /
GUPTA, Maruti 8538 SW Dolph Court Portland, OR 97219 / US | [2016/06] | Representative(s) | Rooney, John-Paul Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2022/28] |
Former [2016/06] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14780270.6 | 21.03.2014 | [2016/06] | WO2014US31509 | Priority number, date | US201361808597P | 04.04.2013 Original published format: US 201361808597 P | [2016/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014165338 | Date: | 09.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2982197 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2982197 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/00, H04W24/08, H04L5/00 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
H04L5/0094 (EP,CN,US);
H04W72/21 (US);
H04B1/38 (US);
H04B7/024 (US);
H04L1/1854 (US);
H04L12/18 (US);
H04L43/0823 (US);
H04L5/0053 (US);
H04L5/0055 (EP,US);
H04L5/14 (US);
H04L65/1016 (EP,US);
H04L65/611 (US);
H04L65/613 (US);
H04L67/02 (US);
H04L67/1076 (US);
H04W24/02 (US);
H04W24/08 (EP,US);
H04W36/0088 (EP,US);
H04W36/0094 (EP,US);
H04W4/70 (EP,US);
H04W56/001 (EP,US);
H04W68/02 (US);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04W72/1215 (US);
H04W72/1263 (US);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04W72/51 (US);
H04W72/52 (US);
H04W74/0808 (US);
H04W76/00 (US);
H04W76/10 (US);
H04W76/11 (US);
H04W76/12 (EP,CN,US);
H04W76/15 (US);
H04W76/22 (EP,CN,US);
H04W76/27 (US);
H04W76/28 (US);
H04W76/30 (CN,US);
H04W76/38 (EP,US);
H04W8/005 (US);
H04B7/0456 (CN,US);
H04B7/0639 (CN,US);
H04L5/0007 (EP,US);
H04L65/1045 (EP,US);
H04L65/1104 (EP,US);
H04W36/14 (EP,CN,US);
H04W36/302 (EP,CN,US);
H04W36/38 (EP,US);
H04W76/20 (US);
H04W84/045 (US);
H04W84/12 (US);
H04W88/02 (US);
H04W88/06 (EP,US);
H04W88/08 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/24] | H04W24/08, H04W76/02, H04L5/00 | ||
Former IPC [2016/06] | H04W68/02, H04W88/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PAGING-WIEDERHOLUNG FÜR ERHÖHTE ROBUSTHEIT FÜR VERLÄNGERTE PAGING-ZYKLEN | [2016/06] | English: | PAGING REPETITION FOR INCREASED ROBUSTNESS FOR EXTENDED PAGING CYCLES | [2016/06] | French: | RÉPÉTITION DE RADIORECHERCHE POUR AMÉLIORER LA ROBUSTESSE POUR DES CYCLES DE RADIORECHERCHE ÉTENDUS | [2016/06] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2015 | Search fee paid | 28.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2015 | Examination requested [2016/06] | 22.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 03.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.04.2020 | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/25] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 03.04.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 03.04.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.04.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 13.07.2022 | AT | 13.07.2022 | CZ | 13.07.2022 | DK | 13.07.2022 | EE | 13.07.2022 | ES | 13.07.2022 | FI | 13.07.2022 | HR | 13.07.2022 | IT | 13.07.2022 | LT | 13.07.2022 | LV | 13.07.2022 | MC | 13.07.2022 | NL | 13.07.2022 | PL | 13.07.2022 | RO | 13.07.2022 | RS | 13.07.2022 | SE | 13.07.2022 | SI | 13.07.2022 | SK | 13.07.2022 | SM | 13.07.2022 | NO | 13.10.2022 | GR | 14.10.2022 | IS | 13.11.2022 | PT | 14.11.2022 | IE | 21.03.2023 | LU | 21.03.2023 | BE | 31.03.2023 | CH | 31.03.2023 | LI | 31.03.2023 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/09] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
IE | 21.03.2023 | ||
LU | 21.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
IE | 21.03.2023 | ||
LU | 21.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/02] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
LU | 21.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 13.07.2022 | |
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
NL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | NL | 13.07.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008155739 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al); | [I]US2009310503 (TENNY NATHAN EDWARD [US], et al) | International search | [A]WO2009118640 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al); | [A]EP2234447 (APPLE INC [US]); | [Y]EP2369883 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]); | [A]WO2012064600 (MOTOROLA MOBILITY INC [US], et al); | [X]US2013015953 (HSU CHIA-CHUN [TW], et al) | by applicant | WO2008155739 | US2009310503 | US2013015953 |