EP2982185 - SOFT ACTIVATION OF CELLULAR MODEMS IN TABLETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2019/36] |
Former [2019/14] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2016/06] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOVINDHASAMY, Karthik 10988 Ivy Hill Drive Unit 2 San Diego, California 92131 / US | [2016/06] | Representative(s) | Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/14] | Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2016/06] | Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 14780363.9 | 10.02.2014 | [2016/06] | WO2014FI50092 | Priority number, date | US201313856202 | 03.04.2013 Original published format: US201313856202 | [2016/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014162042 | Date: | 09.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2982185 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2982185 | Date: | 03.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 09.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/12, H04W12/08, H04W88/06, H04W4/50, H04W76/10, H04M15/00, H04W8/24 | [2018/40] | CPC: |
H04W12/08 (EP,US);
H04W4/50 (EP,US);
H04W8/245 (EP,US);
G06F21/121 (US);
H04M15/00 (US);
H04W76/10 (EP,US);
H04W88/06 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/12] | H04W4/50 | ||
Former IPC [2016/45] | H04W8/24, G06F21/12, H04M15/00, H04W12/08, H04W76/02, H04W88/06, H04W4/00, H04L12/24 | ||
Former IPC [2016/06] | H04W48/18, H04W88/06, H04L12/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SANFTE AKTIVIERUNG VON ZELLULAREN MODEMS IN TABLETS | [2016/06] | English: | SOFT ACTIVATION OF CELLULAR MODEMS IN TABLETS | [2016/06] | French: | ACTIVATION LOGICIELLE DE MODEMS CELLULAIRES DANS DES TABLETTES | [2016/06] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 19.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/06] | 08.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.02.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 26.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.02.2018 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.02.2014 | AL | 03.04.2019 | AT | 03.04.2019 | CY | 03.04.2019 | CZ | 03.04.2019 | DK | 03.04.2019 | EE | 03.04.2019 | ES | 03.04.2019 | FI | 03.04.2019 | HR | 03.04.2019 | IT | 03.04.2019 | LT | 03.04.2019 | LV | 03.04.2019 | MC | 03.04.2019 | MK | 03.04.2019 | MT | 03.04.2019 | NL | 03.04.2019 | PL | 03.04.2019 | RO | 03.04.2019 | RS | 03.04.2019 | SE | 03.04.2019 | SI | 03.04.2019 | SK | 03.04.2019 | SM | 03.04.2019 | TR | 03.04.2019 | BG | 03.07.2019 | NO | 03.07.2019 | GR | 04.07.2019 | IS | 03.08.2019 | PT | 03.08.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 10.02.2014 | |
AL | 03.04.2019 | ||
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CY | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
MT | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 03.04.2019 | |
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 03.04.2019 | |
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | NL | 03.04.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011116459 (LEE JAI-HO [KR], et al) [A] 1-11* abstract *; | [A]US2012171996 (MOCANU IULIAN [CA], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [I]EP2533462 (BROADCOM CORP [US]) [I] 1-11 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0040] * | International search | [Y]US2005138356 (HURWITZ ROGER A [US]); | [Y]US2008297306 (HUAJUN WANG [CA], et al); | [Y]US2010188975 (RALEIGH GREGORY G [US]); | [A]US2010325051 (ETCHEGOYEN CRAIG STEPHEN [US]); | [A]US2011004549 (GRAY ROSS [CA], et al); | [A]US2011130118 (FAN JAMES [US], et al); | [X]US2012171996 (MOCANU IULIAN [CA], et al) | Examination | US2008297306 | by applicant | US2011004549 | US2012171996 | EP2533462 |