EP3052427 - TRANSPORT VEHICLE AND METHOD FOR A PROBLEM-FREE TRANSPORT OF HEAVY-DUTY SHELVES IN WORKSHOPS WITH RADIO SHADOWING USING A PARTLY AUTONOMOUS DRIVE MODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grenzebach Maschinenbau GmbH Albanusstrasse 1-3 86663 Asbach-Baeumenheim / DE | [2016/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÜGLE, Bernhard Glückstrasse 1 86415 Mering / DE | [2016/32] | Representative(s) | Kindermann, Peter Karl-Böhm-Strasse 1 85598 Baldham / DE | [2016/32] | Application number, filing date | 14780404.1 | 29.08.2014 | [2016/32] | WO2014DE00455 | Priority number, date | DE20131016381 | 30.09.2013 Original published format: DE102013016381 | [2016/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015043563 | Date: | 02.04.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3052427 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3052427 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02 | [2019/30] | CPC: |
B66F9/063 (EP,US);
G05D1/0276 (US);
B60P1/02 (US);
B66F9/065 (US);
B66F9/0755 (EP,US);
B66F9/07586 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/32] | B66F9/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRANSPORTFAHRZEUG UND VERFAHREN ZUM STÖRUNGSFREIEN TRANSPORT VON LASTREGALEN IN WERKSHALLEN MIT FUNKABSCHATTUNGEN UND MIT TEILWEISE AUTONOMEM FAHRBETRIEB | [2016/32] | English: | TRANSPORT VEHICLE AND METHOD FOR A PROBLEM-FREE TRANSPORT OF HEAVY-DUTY SHELVES IN WORKSHOPS WITH RADIO SHADOWING USING A PARTLY AUTONOMOUS DRIVE MODE | [2016/32] | French: | VÉHICULE DE TRANSPORT ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LE TRANSPORT SANS PERTURBATION DE RAYONNAGES DE CHARGEMENT DANS DES USINES AVEC PROJECTIONS D'OMBRE RADIO ET UN FONCTIONNEMENT DE ROULAGE PARTIELLEMENT AUTONOME | [2016/32] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/32] | 21.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19212763.7 / EP3636583 | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 11.12.2019 | CY | 11.12.2019 | DK | 11.12.2019 | EE | 11.12.2019 | HR | 11.12.2019 | LT | 11.12.2019 | LV | 11.12.2019 | MC | 11.12.2019 | MK | 11.12.2019 | MT | 11.12.2019 | RO | 11.12.2019 | RS | 11.12.2019 | SM | 11.12.2019 | BG | 11.03.2020 | GR | 12.03.2020 | IS | 11.04.2020 | PT | 06.05.2020 | IE | 29.08.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CY | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
MT | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
IE | 29.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
IE | 29.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | HR | 11.12.2019 | |
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | LT | 11.12.2019 | |
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | LT | 11.12.2019 | |
BG | 11.03.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6390213 (BLEICHER JOEL N [US]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010078232 (ADACHI RYUJI [JP]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102011110196 (SEW EURODRIVE GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US2013177379 (HOFFMAN ROBERT A [US], et al) [A] 1-5* figures 5,6 * | by applicant | DE68928565T |