EP3030556 - SELECTIVE FKBP51 LIGANDS FOR TREATMENT OF PSYCHIATRIC DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technische Universität Darmstadt Karolinenplatz 5 64289 Darmstadt / DE | [2019/35] |
Former [2016/24] | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften Hofgartenstrasse 8 80539 Munich / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAALI, Steffen Georgenstrasse 140 80797 Munich / DE | 02 /
HAUSCH, Felix Wingertstr. 18 64354 Reinheim / DE | 03 /
KIRSCHNER, Alexander Elsenheimerstrasse 24 80687 Munich / DE | 04 /
FENG, Xixi Schäftlarnstrasse 72 81371 Munich / DE | 05 /
BRACHER, Andreas Grimmstrasse 5 80336 Munich / DE | 06 /
RUEHTER, Gerd Vierzigstuecken 53a 21129 Hamburg / DE | [2019/44] |
Former [2017/10] | 01 /
GAALI, Steffen Georgenstrasse 140 80797 Munich / DE | ||
02 /
HAUSCH, Felix Wingertstr. 18 64354 Reinheim / DE | |||
03 /
KIRSCHNER, Alexander Elsenheimerstrasse 24 80687 Munich / DE | |||
04 /
FENG, Xiri Schäftlarnstrasse 72 81371 Munich / DE | |||
05 /
BRACHER, Andreas Grimmstrasse 5 80336 Munich / DE | |||
06 /
RUEHTER, Gerd Vierzigstuecken 53a 21129 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2016/24] | 01 /
GAALI, Steffen Georgenstrasse 140 80797 Munich / DE | ||
02 /
HAUSCH, Felix Hohenzollernstrasse 146 80790 Munich / DE | |||
03 /
KIRSCHNER, Alexander Elsenheimerstrasse 24 80687 Munich / DE | |||
04 /
FENG, Xiri Wolkerweg 12 81375 Munich / DE | |||
05 /
BRACHER, Andreas Grimmstrasse 5 80336 Munich / DE | |||
06 /
RUEHTER, Gerd Vierzigstuecken 53a 21129 Hamburg / DE | Representative(s) | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Tower 185 Friedrich-Ebert-Anlage 35-37 60327 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/44] | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Westhafenplatz 1 60327 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2016/24] | Arth, Hans-Lothar ABK Patent Attorneys Jasminweg 9 14052 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 14781059.2 | 15.09.2014 | [2016/24] | WO2014EP02542 | Priority number, date | EP20130185247 | 19.09.2013 Original published format: EP 13185247 | EP20130196561 | 10.12.2013 Original published format: EP 13196561 | EP20140151510 | 16.01.2014 Original published format: EP 14151510 | [2016/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015039758 | Date: | 26.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3030556 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3030556 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/14, C07D401/12, C07D405/12, C07D207/16, C07D279/12, C07D211/60, C07D211/78, C07K5/06, A61K31/445, A61K31/44, A61K31/40, A61P3/00, A61P25/00, A61P35/00, A61P37/00 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
C07D207/16 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
C07D211/60 (EP,US);
C07D211/78 (EP,US);
C07D279/12 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
C07K5/06139 (EP,US);
C12N9/90 (EP,US);
C12Y502/01008 (EP,US);
G16B15/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/24] | C07D401/14, C07D401/12, C07D405/12, C07D207/16, C07D279/12, C07D211/60, C07D211/78, A61K31/445, A61K31/44, A61K31/40, A61P3/00, A61P25/00, A61P35/00, A61P37/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELEKTIVE FKBP51-LIGANDEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON PSYCHIATRISCHEN STÖRUNGEN | [2016/24] | English: | SELECTIVE FKBP51 LIGANDS FOR TREATMENT OF PSYCHIATRIC DISORDERS | [2016/24] | French: | LIGANDS FKBP51 SÉLECTIFS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES PSYCHIATRIQUES | [2019/13] |
Former [2016/24] | LIGANDS SÉLECTIFS DE LA FKBP51 DESTINÉS AU TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES PSYCHIATRIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/24] | 06.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 31.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.09.2014 | AL | 30.10.2019 | AT | 30.10.2019 | CY | 30.10.2019 | CZ | 30.10.2019 | DK | 30.10.2019 | EE | 30.10.2019 | ES | 30.10.2019 | FI | 30.10.2019 | HR | 30.10.2019 | IT | 30.10.2019 | LT | 30.10.2019 | LV | 30.10.2019 | MC | 30.10.2019 | MK | 30.10.2019 | MT | 30.10.2019 | PL | 30.10.2019 | RO | 30.10.2019 | RS | 30.10.2019 | SE | 30.10.2019 | SI | 30.10.2019 | SK | 30.10.2019 | SM | 30.10.2019 | TR | 30.10.2019 | BG | 30.01.2020 | NO | 30.01.2020 | GR | 31.01.2020 | IS | 29.02.2020 | PT | 02.03.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 15.09.2014 | |
AL | 30.10.2019 | ||
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CY | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
MT | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
TR | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 30.10.2019 | |
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 30.10.2019 | |
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 30.10.2019 | |
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 30.10.2019 | |
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 30.01.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6268384 (NOVAK PERRY M [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6291510 (HAMILTON GREGORY S [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,5,8 * the whole document *; | [X]US2003036654 (HOLT DENNIS A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,8 * example -; claim - *; | [Y]WO2008055488 (ZEDIRA GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1,2,5,8 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2008137476 (BURNHAM INST MEDICAL RESEARCH [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * example -; claim - *; | [A]EP2589383 (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE]) [A] 1-15* the whole document * | Examination | - M. OTHMAN, ET AL., "Intramolecular cyclization of amido acids into pyrrolidinothieno(or [1]benzothieno)[3]azepinediones", JOURNAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY, HeteroCorporation, Provo, UT, US, (199701), vol. 34, no. 1, doi:10.1002/jhet.5570340134, ISSN 0022-152X, pages 225 - 231, XP055451428 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jhet.5570340134 | - W.F. MCCALMONT, ET AL., "Design, synthesis, and biological evaluation of novel T-Type calcium channel antagonists", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, Elsevier Science Publishers, Oxford, GB, (20040607), vol. 14, no. 14, doi:10.1016/J.BMCL.2004.05.011, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 3691 - 3695, XP029594801 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2004.05.011 | - M. NILSSON, ET AL., "Compounds Binding to the S2-S3 Pockets of Thrombin", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, American Chemical Society, Washington, DC, US, (20090416), vol. 52, no. 9, doi:10.1021/jm8011849, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 2708 - 2715, XP055451508 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm8011849 | - C.M. TAYLOR, ET AL., "Factors affecting conformation in proline-containing peptides", ORGANIC LETTERS, American Chemical Society, Washington, DC, US, (20031018), vol. 5, no. 23, doi:10.1021/ol035711r, ISSN 1523-7060, pages 4413 - 4416, XP055451539 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ol035711r | - L. MULEY, ET AL., "Enhancement of hydrophobic interactions and hydrogen bond strength by cooperativity: Synthesis, modeling, and molecular dynamics simulations of a congeneric series of thrombin inhibitors", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, American Chemical Society, Washington, DC, US, (20100211), vol. 53, no. 5, doi:10.1021/jm9016416, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 2126 - 2135, XP055089735 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm9016416 | - A. LILJEBLAD, ET AL., "Enantioselective lipase-catalysed reactions of methyl pipecolinate: transesterification and N-acylation", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, Elsevier Science Publishers, Amsterdam, NL, (20020223), vol. 43, no. 13, doi:10.1016/S0040-4039(02)00288-5, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 2471 - 2474, XP004343003 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(02)00288-5 | - XIXI FENG, ET AL., "Structure-affinity relationship analysis of selective FKBP51 ligands", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, American Chemical Society, Washington, DC, US, (20150930), vol. 58, no. 19, doi:10.1021/acs.jmedchem.5b00785, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 7796 - 7806, XP055510638 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.jmedchem.5b00785 | - R. GOPALAKRISHNAN, ET AL., "Evaluation of synthetic FK506 analogues as ligands for the FK506-binding proteins 51 and 52", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, American Chemical Society, Washington, DC, US, (20120510), vol. 55, no. 9, doi:10.1021/jm201746x, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 4114 - 4122, XP055050762 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm201746x |