EP3055663 - EXTRACTION DEVICE, METHOD AND USE FOR OBTAINING A SAMPLE OF A MEDIUM TO BE EXTRACTED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/33] | EXTRACTION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OBTAINING A SAMPLE OF A MEDIUM TO BE EXTRACTED | ||
[2021/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.09.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sartorius Stedim Biotech GmbH August-Spindler-Strasse 11 37079 Göttingen / DE | [2021/48] |
Former [2016/33] | For all designated states Sartorius Stedim Biotech GmbH August-Spindler-Strasse 11 37079 Göttingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÜNNECKE, Wolfgang Am Bürgerpark 4C 38102 Braunschweig / DE | 02 /
PREDIGER, Andreas Klinkerfuesstrasse 48 37073 Göttingen / DE | [2016/33] | Representative(s) | Vigand, Philippe, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex - Genève / CH | [2021/48] |
Former [2016/33] | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14781176.4 | 06.10.2014 | [2016/33] | WO2014EP71345 | Priority number, date | DE201310220290 | 08.10.2013 Original published format: DE102013220290 | [2016/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015052134 | Date: | 16.04.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3055663 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3055663 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/14, B65B57/14, B65B3/00, C12M1/26, G01N1/20 | [2016/33] | CPC: |
G01N1/2035 (EP,US);
B65B3/003 (EP,US);
G01N1/14 (EP,US);
C12M33/04 (EP,US);
G01N2001/205 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENTNAHMEVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNG ZUM GEWINNEN EINER PROBE EINES ZU ENTNEHMENDEN MEDIUMS | [2021/38] | English: | EXTRACTION DEVICE, METHOD AND USE FOR OBTAINING A SAMPLE OF A MEDIUM TO BE EXTRACTED | [2021/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRÉLÈVEMENT, PROCÉDÉ ET UTILISATION POUR OBTENIR UN ÉCHANTILLON D'UN MILIEU À PRÉLEVER | [2021/38] |
Former [2016/33] | ENTNAHMEVORRICHTUNG SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM GEWINNEN EINER PROBE EINES ZU ENTNEHMENDEN MEDIUMS | ||
Former [2016/33] | EXTRACTION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OBTAINING A SAMPLE OF A MEDIUM TO BE EXTRACTED | ||
Former [2016/33] | DISPOSITIF DE PRÉLÈVEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ POUR OBTENIR UN ÉCHANTILLON D'UN MILIEU À PRÉLEVER | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/33] | 27.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.10.2014 | AL | 01.12.2021 | CY | 01.12.2021 | CZ | 01.12.2021 | DK | 01.12.2021 | EE | 01.12.2021 | ES | 01.12.2021 | FI | 01.12.2021 | HR | 01.12.2021 | IT | 01.12.2021 | LT | 01.12.2021 | LV | 01.12.2021 | MC | 01.12.2021 | MK | 01.12.2021 | MT | 01.12.2021 | NL | 01.12.2021 | PL | 01.12.2021 | RO | 01.12.2021 | RS | 01.12.2021 | SE | 01.12.2021 | SI | 01.12.2021 | SK | 01.12.2021 | SM | 01.12.2021 | TR | 01.12.2021 | BG | 01.03.2022 | NO | 01.03.2022 | GR | 02.03.2022 | IS | 01.04.2022 | PT | 01.04.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 06.10.2014 | |
AL | 01.12.2021 | ||
CY | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
IT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
MK | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
TR | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 06.10.2014 | |
AL | 01.12.2021 | ||
CY | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
IT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
MK | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 06.10.2014 | |
AL | 01.12.2021 | ||
CY | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
IT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 06.10.2014 | |
AL | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
IT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
IT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | CZ | 01.12.2021 | |
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | CZ | 01.12.2021 | |
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 01.12.2021 | |
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 01.12.2021 | |
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | ES | 01.12.2021 | |
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | ES | 01.12.2021 | |
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | ES | 01.12.2021 | |
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | ES | 01.12.2021 | |
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | ES | 01.12.2021 | |
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 01.12.2021 | |
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 01.12.2021 | |
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 01.03.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2009305407 (TEMPLE JOHN [US]) [X] 1-4,6,8,9,16,20-22 * paragraphs [0002] , [0005] , [0019] , [0020]; figures 1A,1B,2A,2B * [Y] 13-15,18,19 [I] 7,10-12,17; | [XAI]US5101670 (STEGER JOETTE L [US], et al) [X] 1,5,8,9,16 * column 1, line 6 - line 32 * * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 60; figure 1 * [A] 3,13-15,18,19 [I] 2,10-12,17,20-22; | [XAI]US7874221 (MAYEAUX DONALD P [US]) [X] 1,5,8,16 * column 6, line 28 - line 67; figure 1 * * column 8, line 60 - line 67; figure 2 * [A] 3,13-15,18,19 [I] 2,7,10-12,17,21,22; | [A]US2002170364 (GERARD VISSER JOHAN [NL], et al) [A] 7 * paragraph [0013]; figure 1 *; | [A]US5172332 (HUNGERFORD WILLIAM G [US], et al) [A] 10,17 * column 6, line 23 - line 44; figure 3 *; | [Y]US3656349 (COLLINS HENRY R JR) [Y] 13-15,18,19 * column 4, line 32 - line 64; figure 6 *; | [A]US2013240082 (MUELLER MICHAEL [DE]) [A] 7 * paragraph [0038]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2010236340 (LEE CHANYONG BRIAN [US], et al) [A] 10,17 * paragraph [0023]; figure 3 * | Examination | DE10336539 | - Anonymous, "Peristaltic pump - Wikipedia", (20200523), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Peristaltic_pump, (20200619), XP055706826 | - Physik Instrumente USA - Precision Motion Control, "Piezo Pump, Ultrasonic for Medical Engineering, by www.pi-medical.net", YouTube, (20101214), pages 1 - 1, URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=CSqUStRTBA0, (20200619), XP054980602 |