EP3055643 - A NANO-SENSITIVE FOURIER-DOMAIN OPTICAL COHERENCE TOMOGRAPHY INSPECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National University of Ireland Galway University Road Galway / IE | [2016/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALEXANDROV, Sergey 40 Cuan na Coille Fort Lorenzo Salthill Galway / IE | 02 /
SUBHASH, Hrebesh c/o National University of Ireland University Road Galway / IE | 03 /
LEAHY, Martin J. The Millstream Abbeyfeale County Limerick / IE | 04 /
ZAM, Azhar c/o National University of Ireland University Road Galway / IE | [2019/21] |
Former [2016/33] | 01 /
ALEXANDROV, Sergey 239 Corrib Park Newcastle Galway / IE | ||
02 /
SUBHASH, Hrebesh c/o National University of Ireland University Road Galway / IE | |||
03 /
LEAHY, Martin J. The Millstream Abbeyfeale County Limerick / IE | |||
04 /
ZAM, Azhar c/o National University of Ireland University Road Galway / IE | Representative(s) | Weldon O'Brien Ltd. Shannon Lodge Casement Road Bandon County Cork, P72 TN24 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/31] | Weldon, Michael James, et al John A. O'Brien & Associates Unit 4, The Courtyard Business Centre Orchard Lane Blackrock, County Dublin, A94 NV07 / IE | ||
Former [2016/33] | Weldon, Michael James, et al John A. O'Brien & Associates Third Floor Duncairn House 14 Carysfort Avenue Blackrock, Co. Dublin / IE | Application number, filing date | 14781556.7 | 08.10.2014 | [2016/33] | WO2014EP71536 | Priority number, date | EP20130188342 | 11.10.2013 Original published format: EP 13188342 | [2016/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015052232 | Date: | 16.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3055643 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3055643 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01B9/02, A61B5/00, G01N21/47 | [2016/33] | CPC: |
G01B9/02044 (EP,US);
A61B5/0066 (EP,US);
A61B5/7257 (EP,US);
G01B9/02004 (US);
G01B9/02083 (EP,US);
G01B9/02087 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EIN INSPEKTIONSSYSTEM BASIEREND AUF OPTISCHER KOHÄRENZTOMOGRAPHIE IM SPEKTRALBEREICH MIT NANOMETER EMPFINDLICHKEIT | [2019/15] | English: | A NANO-SENSITIVE FOURIER-DOMAIN OPTICAL COHERENCE TOMOGRAPHY INSPECTION SYSTEM | [2016/33] | French: | SYSTÈME D'INSPECTION À TOMOGRAPHIE PAR COHÉRENCE OPTIQUE DANS LE DOMAINE DE FOURIER DU TYPE NANO-SENSIBLE | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/33] | NANOEMPFINDLICHES FOURIERDOMÄNEN-KOHÄRENZTOMOGRAFIE-INSPEKTIONSSYSTEM | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/33] | 28.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.10.2014 | AL | 31.07.2019 | AT | 31.07.2019 | CY | 31.07.2019 | CZ | 31.07.2019 | DK | 31.07.2019 | EE | 31.07.2019 | ES | 31.07.2019 | FI | 31.07.2019 | HR | 31.07.2019 | IT | 31.07.2019 | LT | 31.07.2019 | LV | 31.07.2019 | MC | 31.07.2019 | MK | 31.07.2019 | MT | 31.07.2019 | NL | 31.07.2019 | PL | 31.07.2019 | RO | 31.07.2019 | RS | 31.07.2019 | SE | 31.07.2019 | SI | 31.07.2019 | SK | 31.07.2019 | SM | 31.07.2019 | TR | 31.07.2019 | LU | 08.10.2019 | IS | 30.10.2019 | BE | 31.10.2019 | BG | 31.10.2019 | CH | 31.10.2019 | LI | 31.10.2019 | NO | 31.10.2019 | GR | 01.11.2019 | PT | 02.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 08.10.2014 | |
AL | 31.07.2019 | ||
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CY | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
MT | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LU | 08.10.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 08.10.2014 | |
AL | 31.07.2019 | ||
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CY | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LU | 08.10.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CY | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LU | 08.10.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LU | 08.10.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LU | 08.10.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LU | 08.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 31.07.2019 | |
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 31.07.2019 | |
NO | 31.10.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XDI] - Sergey A. Alexandrov ET AL, "Real-time quantitative visualization of 3D structural information", OPTICS EXPRESS, (20120405), pages 9203 - 9214, URL: http://www.opticsinfobase.org/DirectPDFAccess/E9AFDB18-0D4B-2451-C43D03699D01C60F_231764/oe-20-8-9203.pdf?da=1&id=231764&seq=0&mobile=no, (20140214), XP055102387 [XD] 1-7,12-15,19,20 * Sections 1 - 5;;; figures 1-7 * [I] 8-11,16-18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.20.009203 | [AD] - JI YI ET AL, "Can OCT be sensitive to nanoscale structural alterations in biological tissue?", OPTICS EXPRESS, (20130404), vol. 21, no. 7, doi:10.1364/OE.21.009043, ISSN 1094-4087, page 9043, XP055156608 [AD] 1-20 * abstract * * Sections 1 and 2;;; figures 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.21.009043 | [AD] - Shikhar Uttam ET AL, "Tomographic imaging via spectral encoding of spatial frequency", Optics express, United States, doi:10.1364/OE.21.007488, (20130319), pages 7488 - 156, URL: http://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pubmed/23546131, (20141204), XP055102354 [AD] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.21.007488 | by applicant | - YI, J. ET AL., "Can OCT be sensitive to nanoscale structural alterations in biological tissue?", OPT. EXPRESS, (2013), vol. 21, pages 9043 - 9059 | - COTTE, Y. ET AL., "Marker-free phase nanoscopy", NATURE PHOTON, (2013), vol. 7, pages 113 - 117 | - WANG, Z. ET AL., "Optical virtual imaging at 50 nm lateral resolution with a white light nanoscope", NAT. COMMUN., (2011), page 2 | - GUILLAUME, M. ET AL., "Experimental Demonstration of Quantitative Imaging beyond Abbe's Limit with Optical Diffraction Tomography", PHYS. REV. LETT., (2009), vol. 102, page 213905 | - HUANG, D. ET AL., "Optical Coherence Tomography", SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 254, pages 1178 - 1181 | - ALEXANDROV, S. A.; UTTAM, S.; BISTA, R. K.; STATON, K.; LIU, Y., "Spectral encoding of spatial frequency approach for characterization of nanoscale structures", APPL PHYS LETT, (2012), vol. 101, page 033702 | - UTTAM, S.; ALEXANDROV, S. A.; BISTA, R. K.; LIU, Y., "Tomographic imaging via spectral encoding of spatial frequency", OPT. EXPRESS, (2013), vol. 21, pages 7488 - 7504 | - J. ENFIELD; E. JONATHAN; M. LEAHY, "In vivo imaging of the microcirculation of the volar forearm using correlation mapping optical coherence tomography (cmOCT", BIOMEDICAL OPTICS EXPRESS, (20110501), vol. 2, pages 1184 - 1193 | - T. S. RALSTON; D. L. MARKS; P. S. CARNEY; S. A. BOPPART, "Interferometric synthetic aperture microscopy", NATURE PHYSICS, (200702), vol. 3, pages 129 - 134 | - SERGEY, A ET AL., "Real-time quantitative visualisation of 3D structural information", OPTICS EXPRESS, (20120409), vol. 20, no. 8, pages 9203 - 9214 | - SHIKHAR UTTAM ET AL., "Investigation of depth-resolved nanoscale structural changes in regulated cell proliferation and chromatin decondensation", BIOMEDICAL OPTICS EXPESS, (20130322), pages 596 - 613 |