EP3195654 - METHOD FOR ACTIVATING AND DEACTIVATING NOMADIC NODES IN A NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Hansaallee 205 40549 Düsseldorf / DE | [2017/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BULAKCI, Oemer c/o Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstrasse 25 80992 Munich / DE | 02 /
EICHINGER, Josef c/o Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstrasse 25 80992 Munich / DE | 03 /
ZHOU, Chan c/o Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstrasse 25 80992 Munich / DE | [2017/30] | Representative(s) | Kreuz, Georg Maria Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstraße 25 80992 München / DE | [2019/50] |
Former [2017/30] | Kreuz, Georg Maria Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstrasse 8 80992 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14781889.2 | 09.10.2014 | [2017/30] | WO2014EP71616 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016055108 | Date: | 14.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3195654 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3195654 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/04, H04W84/00 | [2017/30] | CPC: |
H04W36/04 (EP,CN);
H04W84/005 (EP,CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM AKTIVIEREN UND DEAKTIVIEREN NOMADISCHER KNOTEN IN EINEM NETZWERK | [2017/30] | English: | METHOD FOR ACTIVATING AND DEACTIVATING NOMADIC NODES IN A NETWORK | [2017/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ACTIVATION ET DE DÉSACTIVATION DE NOEUDS NOMADES DANS UN RÉSEAU | [2017/30] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/30] | 18.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.10.2014 | AL | 11.12.2019 | AT | 11.12.2019 | CY | 11.12.2019 | CZ | 11.12.2019 | DK | 11.12.2019 | EE | 11.12.2019 | FI | 11.12.2019 | HR | 11.12.2019 | IT | 11.12.2019 | LT | 11.12.2019 | LV | 11.12.2019 | MC | 11.12.2019 | MK | 11.12.2019 | MT | 11.12.2019 | NL | 11.12.2019 | PL | 11.12.2019 | RO | 11.12.2019 | RS | 11.12.2019 | SE | 11.12.2019 | SI | 11.12.2019 | SK | 11.12.2019 | SM | 11.12.2019 | TR | 11.12.2019 | BG | 11.03.2020 | NO | 11.03.2020 | GR | 12.03.2020 | IS | 11.04.2020 | PT | 06.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 09.10.2014 | |
AL | 11.12.2019 | ||
AT | 11.12.2019 | ||
CY | 11.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
IT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
MT | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
PL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
TR | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
AT | 11.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
IT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
PL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
AT | 11.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
IT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
PL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
AT | 11.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 11.12.2019 | |
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 11.12.2019 | |
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 11.12.2019 | |
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 11.03.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP2387279 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 4,11 * paragraphs [0037] , [0085] , [0142] *; | [XY]US2012282932 (YU LING [FI], et al) [X] 1,14 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraphs [0034] , [0036] , [0037] , [0038] , [0039] * * paragraphs [0077] , [0078] , [0079] * * paragraphs [0080] , [0081] , [0082] , [0083] - [0088] * * paragraphs [0092] , [0097] * * paragraphs [0108] , [0114] , [0116] , [0117] * * paragraph [0132] * * paragraphs [0150] , [0152] - [0157] * [Y] 2-13,15; | [Y]US2013183971 (TAMAKI NOBUYUKI [US], et al) [Y] 2,5-9,12,13,15 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraphs [0018] , [0019] * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0064] * * paragraphs [0116] , [0117] * * paragraph [0129] * * paragraphs [0130] - [0132] - [0134] * * paragraph [0150] * * paragraph [0195] * * paragraph [0228] * * paragraphs [0257] , [0260] * * paragraph [0322] *; | [Y] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Study on architecture enhancements to support Proximity-based Services (ProSe) (Release 12)", (20131126), 3GPP DRAFT; 23703-081-PROSE-RM, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_sa/WG2_Arch/Latest_SA2_Specs/Latest_draft_S2_Specs/, (20131126), XP050764394 [Y] 3,10 * §6.4.2.1.1 * | Examination | US2012087303 |