|
24.04.2025 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.2025 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.2025 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.04.2025 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2025 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2025 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2025 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2025 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2025 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2025 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.04.2025 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2025 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.04.2025 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.04.2025 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.03.2025 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.2025 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2024 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.10.2024 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.10.2024 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.10.2024 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.10.2024 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.10.2024 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.10.2024 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.10.2024 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.10.2024 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.10.2024 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.10.2024 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.10.2024 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 06 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.10.2024 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 07 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.10.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.10.2024 |
Main request during appeals procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.10.2024 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
13.06.2024 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2024 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 033 |
Appeal |
20 |
|
07.06.2024 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 034 |
Appeal |
22 |
|
07.06.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2024 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
23 |
|
10.04.2024 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.04.2024 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.04.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.04.2024 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.02.2024 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.02.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
87 |
|
07.02.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
87 |
|
07.02.2024 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2024 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
07.02.2024 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
07.02.2024 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.02.2024 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.02.2024 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.02.2024 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.02.2024 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2024 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2024 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2024 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2024 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
33 |
|
09.11.2023 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.09.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
12.09.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
12.09.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 05 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 06 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 07 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.09.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 032 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.09.2023 |
Consolidated list of cited opposition documents |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.09.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.09.2023 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.09.2023 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.09.2023 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.09.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 031 |
Opposition |
23 |
|
07.09.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.09.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.09.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.09.2023 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2023 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
11 |
|
21.02.2023 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
21.02.2023 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.02.2023 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2023 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.02.2023 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.02.2023 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
21.02.2023 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
25.08.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
22.08.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.08.2022 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.08.2022 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.08.2022 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.08.2022 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.08.2022 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.08.2022 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.08.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 026 |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.08.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 027 |
Opposition |
7 |
|
22.08.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 028 |
Opposition |
8 |
|
22.08.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 029 |
Opposition |
10 |
|
22.08.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 030 |
Opposition |
11 |
|
22.08.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.08.2022 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.08.2022 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.08.2022 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
13.04.2022 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2022 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.04.2022 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
33 |
|
29.03.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.03.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 001 |
Opposition |
16 |
|
29.03.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 002 |
Opposition |
55 |
|
29.03.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 003 |
Opposition |
20 |
|
29.03.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 004 |
Opposition |
19 |
|
29.03.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 005 |
Opposition |
161 |
|
29.03.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 006 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.03.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 007 |
Opposition |
8 |
|
29.03.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 008 |
Opposition |
18 |
|
29.03.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 009 |
Opposition |
20 |
|
29.03.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 010 |
Opposition |
27 |
|
29.03.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 011 |
Opposition |
28 |
|
29.03.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 012 |
Opposition |
17 |
|
29.03.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 013 |
Opposition |
21 |
|
29.03.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 014 |
Opposition |
32 |
|
29.03.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 015 |
Opposition |
11 |
|
29.03.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 016 |
Opposition |
55 |
|
29.03.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 017 |
Opposition |
26 |
|
29.03.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 018 |
Opposition |
17 |
|
29.03.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 019 |
Opposition |
36 |
|
29.03.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 020 |
Opposition |
13 |
|
29.03.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 021 |
Opposition |
8 |
|
29.03.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 022 |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.03.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 023 |
Opposition |
24 |
|
29.03.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 024 |
Opposition |
27 |
|
29.03.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 025 |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.03.2022 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
25 |
|
29.03.2022 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
10.11.2021 |
Document concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2021 |
Payment submission rejected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2021 |
Registration under Rule 23 EPC |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.05.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2021 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.05.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.05.2021 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2021 |
Deficiencies as to Rule 23 EPC |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.04.2021 |
Rule 23 - Annex B |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.03.2021 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.12.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
09.12.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
21.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
21.10.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
21.10.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.10.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.05.2020 |
Document concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.05.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.05.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.05.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.02.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.02.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.10.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.10.2019 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.10.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.07.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.07.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.03.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.03.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.01.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.01.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.01.2017 |
Statement of non-availability of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2016 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2016 |
Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.06.2016 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2016 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.04.2016 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.04.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2016 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
14.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2015 |
Information regarding early processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
26.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.03.2015 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.03.2015 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.03.2015 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
18.11.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
18.11.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.11.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
26.09.2014 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
26.09.2014 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
26.09.2014 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
27 |