Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2983600 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2983600



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(60)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 380
29.03.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
04.06.2018 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
26.04.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
10.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.04.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
10.04.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
10.04.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
10.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
05.12.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
05.12.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
05.12.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
05.12.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 59
05.12.2017 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 62
31.10.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
19.07.2017 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
19.07.2017 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
18.07.2017 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
30.06.2017 Annexes in respect of a client data request Search / examination 3
22.06.2017 Annexes in respect of a client data request Search / examination 5
15.06.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
15.06.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
15.06.2017 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
15.06.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
15.06.2017 Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
15.06.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
10.05.2017 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
10.05.2017 Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) Search / examination 8
11.01.2017 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
22.12.2016 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
22.12.2016 European search opinion Search / examination 2
22.12.2016 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
22.12.2016 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
07.12.2016 Search started Search / examination 1
29.06.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
29.06.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
29.06.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
20.01.2016 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
04.01.2016 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
23.12.2015 EPO/applicant correspondence crossed Search / examination 1
23.12.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
23.12.2015 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
23.12.2015 Request for further processing allowed Search / examination 1
23.12.2015 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
17.12.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-entry into European phase) Search / examination 2
17.12.2015 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
02.12.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
25.11.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.11.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.11.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.11.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
05.11.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
05.11.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
05.11.2015 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
27.10.2015 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
13.10.2015 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
21.08.2015 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
05.11.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 63
16.10.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
16.10.2014 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 61