EP2938130 - METHOD AND MOBILE TERMINAL FOR MANAGING A CELL LOCK LIST IN A MOBILE TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/44] | MANAGEMENT METHOD FOR MOBILE TERMINAL COMMUNICATION AND MOBILE TERMINAL | ||
[2016/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Device Co., Ltd. Building B2 Huawei Industrial Base Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2015/44] | For all designated states Huawei Device Co., Ltd. Building B2 Huawei Industrial Base Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QU, Wei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2015/44] | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/44] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14782817.2 | 09.04.2014 | [2015/44] | WO2014CN74956 | Priority number, date | CN201310121469 | 09.04.2013 Original published format: CN201310121469 | [2015/44] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014166382 | Date: | 16.10.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2938130 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2938130 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/02, H04W8/18 | [2016/12] | CPC: |
H04W48/02 (EP);
H04W8/183 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2015/44] | H04W48/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ENDGARÄT FÜR DIE VERWALTUNG EINER ZELLBLOCKIERTLISTE IN EINEM MOBILES ENDGERÄT | [2016/30] | English: | METHOD AND MOBILE TERMINAL FOR MANAGING A CELL LOCK LIST IN A MOBILE TERMINAL | [2016/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET TERMINAL MOBILE POUR LA GESTION D'UNE LISTE DE VERROUILLAGE DES CELLULES DANS UN TERMINAL MOBILE | [2016/30] |
Former [2015/44] | VERWALTUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR DIE KOMMUNIKATION ÜBER EIN MOBILES ENDGERÄT UND MOBILES ENDGERÄT | ||
Former [2015/44] | MANAGEMENT METHOD FOR MOBILE TERMINAL COMMUNICATION AND MOBILE TERMINAL | ||
Former [2015/44] | PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION POUR COMMUNICATION DE TERMINAL MOBILE ET TERMINAL MOBILE | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2015 | Translation filed | 22.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2015 | Search fee paid | 22.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/44] | 27.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.04.2014 | AL | 28.12.2016 | AT | 28.12.2016 | BE | 28.12.2016 | CY | 28.12.2016 | CZ | 28.12.2016 | DK | 28.12.2016 | EE | 28.12.2016 | ES | 28.12.2016 | FI | 28.12.2016 | HR | 28.12.2016 | IT | 28.12.2016 | LT | 28.12.2016 | LV | 28.12.2016 | MC | 28.12.2016 | MK | 28.12.2016 | NL | 28.12.2016 | PL | 28.12.2016 | RO | 28.12.2016 | RS | 28.12.2016 | SE | 28.12.2016 | SI | 28.12.2016 | SK | 28.12.2016 | SM | 28.12.2016 | TR | 28.12.2016 | BG | 28.03.2017 | NO | 28.03.2017 | GR | 29.03.2017 | IE | 09.04.2017 | LU | 09.04.2017 | MT | 09.04.2017 | IS | 28.04.2017 | PT | 28.04.2017 | CH | 30.04.2017 | LI | 30.04.2017 | FR | 02.05.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 09.04.2014 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CY | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
MK | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
TR | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 09.04.2017 | ||
LU | 09.04.2017 | ||
MT | 09.04.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 09.04.2014 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CY | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
MK | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 09.04.2017 | ||
LU | 09.04.2017 | ||
MT | 09.04.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HU | 09.04.2014 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CY | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 09.04.2017 | ||
LU | 09.04.2017 | ||
MT | 09.04.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 09.04.2014 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 09.04.2017 | ||
LU | 09.04.2017 | ||
MT | 09.04.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 09.04.2017 | ||
LU | 09.04.2017 | ||
MT | 09.04.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 09.04.2017 | ||
LU | 09.04.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 09.04.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
FR | 02.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | BE | 28.12.2016 | |
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 28.12.2016 | |
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | FI | 28.12.2016 | |
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 28.12.2016 | |
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 28.12.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN101656950 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-16 * pages 1,2,4,5 *; | [A]CN102075911 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-16 * pages 1,2 *; | [A]US2004072574 (MATZ WILLIAM R [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0058] *; | [A]CN102026126 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-16 * page 1 - page 4 * | International search | [A]CN101106815 (CHINA MOBILE GROUP JIANGSU COM [CN]); | [Y]CN101466087 (NINGBO SAGEM BIRD RES AND DEV [CN]); | [Y]CN101656950 (ZTE CORP) |