EP2984184 - USE OF DNQ OR DNQ-87 IN COMBINATION WITH A PARP1 INHIBITOR FOR THE TREATMENT OF CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/07] | TUMOR-SELECTIVE COMBINATION THERAPY | ||
[2020/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the University of Illinois 352 Henry Administration Building 506 South Wright Street Urbana, IL 61801 / US | For all designated states The Board of Regents of the University of Texas System 210 West 7th Street Austin, TX 78701 / US | [2021/07] |
Former [2016/07] | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the University of Illinois 352 Henry Administration Building 506 South Wright Street Urbana, IL 61801 / US | ||
For all designated states The Board of Regents of The University of Texas System 201 West 7th Street Austin, TX 78701 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERGENROTHER, Paul J. 2607 Wedgewood Drive Champaign Illinois 61822 / US | 02 /
BOOTHMAN, David A. 6834 Mimosa Lane Dallas Texas 75230 / US | 03 /
BAIR, Joseph S. 209 Lincoln Mill Rd Mullica Hill, NJ 08062 / US | 04 /
CAO, Lifen 5720 Forest Park Road Apt. 1508 Dallas Texas 75235 / US | 05 /
GAO, Jimming 3200 Prestonwood Drive Plano Texas 75093 / US | 06 /
HUANG, Xiumei 6401 Maple Avenue Apt. 9302 Dallas Texas 75235 / US | 07 /
LUO, Xiuquan 8412 Halliford Court Plano Texas 75024 / US | 08 /
MA, Xinpeng 10809 North Central Expressway Apt. 3250 Dallas Texas 75231 / US | 09 /
MOORE, Zachary R. 2929 Wycliff Avenue Apt. 2243 Dallas Texas 75219 / US | 10 /
PARKINSON, Elizabeth I. 1735 Valley Road Apt. C Champaign Illinois 61820 / US | [2020/48] |
Former [2016/07] | 01 /
HERGENROTHER, Paul J. 2607 Wedgewood Drive Champaign Illinois 61822 / US | ||
02 /
BOOTHMAN, David A. 6834 Mimosa Lane Dallas Texas 75230 / US | |||
03 /
BAIR, Joseph S. 209 Lincoln Mill Road Millica Hill, NJ 08062 / US | |||
04 /
CAO, Lifen 5720 Forest Park Road Apt. 1508 Dallas Texas 75235 / US | |||
05 /
GAO, Jimming 3200 Prestonwood Drive Plano Texas 75093 / US | |||
06 /
HUANG, Xiumei 6401 Maple Avenue Apt. 9302 Dallas Texas 75235 / US | |||
07 /
LUO, Xiuquan 8412 Halliford Court Plano Texas 75024 / US | |||
08 /
MA, Xinpeng 10809 North Central Expressway Apt. 3250 Dallas Texas 75231 / US | |||
09 /
MOORE, Zachary R. 2929 Wycliff Avenue Apt. 2243 Dallas Texas 75219 / US | |||
10 /
PARKINSON, Elizabeth I. 1735 Valley Road Apt. C Champaign Illinois 61820 / US | Representative(s) | Rückerl, Florian Dehmel & Bettenhausen Patentanwälte PartmbB Herzogspitalstraße 11 80331 München / DE | [2020/48] |
Former [2016/07] | Rückerl, Florian Dehmel und Bettenhausen Herzogspitalstraße 11 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14783210.9 | 08.04.2014 | [2016/07] | WO2014US33400 | Priority number, date | US201361810008P | 09.04.2013 Original published format: US 201361810008 P | [2016/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014168991 | Date: | 16.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2984184 | Date: | 17.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2984184 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/353, A61K31/352, A61K31/706, C12Q1/68, A61K45/06, A61P35/00, A61K31/131, A61K31/4738, A61K31/4745 | [2016/48] | CPC: |
A61K31/706 (EP,US);
C12Q1/68 (MX);
A61K31/131 (EP,MX,US);
A61K31/352 (MX);
A61K31/353 (EP,MX,US);
A61K31/4738 (EP,MX,US);
A61K31/4745 (EP,MX,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,MX,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12Q1/6886 (EP,MX,US);
C12Q2600/106 (EP,MX,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,MX,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/131, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/353, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4738, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2016/07] | C12Q1/68, A61K31/352, A61K45/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON DNQ ODER DNQ-87 IN KOMBINATION MIT EINEM PARP1 HEMMER ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS | [2020/25] | English: | USE OF DNQ OR DNQ-87 IN COMBINATION WITH A PARP1 INHIBITOR FOR THE TREATMENT OF CANCER | [2020/25] | French: | UTILISATION DE DNQ OU DNQ-87 EN COMBINAISON AVEC UN INHIBITEUR DE LA PARP1 POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER | [2020/25] |
Former [2016/07] | TUMORSELEKTIVE KOMBINATIONSTHERAPIE | ||
Former [2016/07] | TUMOR-SELECTIVE COMBINATION THERAPY | ||
Former [2016/07] | POLYTHÉRAPIE POUR TUMEUR SÉLECTIVE | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2015 | Search fee paid | 06.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/07] | 11.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 25.11.2020 | CY | 25.11.2020 | EE | 25.11.2020 | FI | 25.11.2020 | HR | 25.11.2020 | LT | 25.11.2020 | LV | 25.11.2020 | MC | 25.11.2020 | MK | 25.11.2020 | MT | 25.11.2020 | RO | 25.11.2020 | RS | 25.11.2020 | SI | 25.11.2020 | SK | 25.11.2020 | SM | 25.11.2020 | BG | 25.02.2021 | NO | 25.02.2021 | IS | 25.03.2021 | LU | 08.04.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
CY | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
MK | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
LU | 08.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
CY | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
LU | 08.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
LU | 08.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
LU | 08.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
LU | 08.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | EE | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 25.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2013030237 (THEUER CHARLES [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0027]; claims 1,7, 9, 17, *; | [Y] - X. HUANG ET AL, "An NQO1 Substrate with Potent Antitumor Activity That Selectively Kills by PARP1-Induced Programmed Necrosis", CANCER RESEARCH, (20120615), vol. 72, no. 12, doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-11-3135, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 3038 - 3047, XP055187225 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-11-3135 | [Y] - JOSEPH S. BAIR ET AL, "Chemistry and Biology of Deoxynyboquinone, a Potent Inducer of Cancer Cell Death", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20100421), vol. 132, no. 15, doi:10.1021/ja100610m, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 5469 - 5478, XP055187222 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja100610m | International search | [A]US4906562 (HELLSTROM INGEGERD [US], et al); | [A]US5716963 (AVENDAO LOPEZ CARMEN [ES], et al); | [Y]US2002198264 (GERSON STANTON L [US], et al); | [A]US2004001871 (BOOTHMAN DAVID [US], et al); | [A]US6809096 (DELFOURNE EVELYNE [FR], et al); | [A]US2005175668 (BOOTHMAN DAVID [US], et al); | [A]US2009163570 (MIREJOVSKY DORLA [US], et al); | [Y]US2009275608 (OSSOVSKAYA VALERIA S [US], et al); | [X]WO2012040492 (UNIV TEXAS [US], et al); | [A]US2012142650 (HOLLINGSWORTH JOHN [US], et al); | [A]US2012208767 (JAISWAL ANIL K [US]) | by applicant | US6833373 | WO2012040492 | US2013030237 | WO2013056073 | - BLANCOBOOTHMANGAO et al., Cancer Res., (20100000), vol. 70, page 3896 | - HUANG et al., Cancer Res., (20120615), vol. 72, no. 12, pages 3038 - 3047 | - BAIR et al., J Am Chem Soc., (20100421), vol. 132, no. 15, pages 5469 - 5478 | - IAN T. HARRISONSHUYEN HARRISON, Compendium of Organic Synthetic Methods, John Wiley & Sons, (19710000), vol. 1 | - IAN T. HARRISONSHUYEN HARRISON, COMPENDIUM OF ORGANIC SYNTHETIC METHODS, (19840000), vol. 6 | - Comprehensive Organic Synthesis; Selectivity, Strategy & Efficiency in Modern Organic Chemistry, Pergamon Press, (19930000), vol. 9 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, Mack Printing Company, (19900000), pages 1289 - 1329 |