EP3057629 - DRUG DELIVERY DEVICE WITH BRAKE MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [2016/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SØRENSEN, Morten Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | 02 /
KVOLSBJERG, Bo Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | 03 /
MADSEN, Kalle Holck Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | 04 /
PLAMBECH, Christian Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [2016/34] | Application number, filing date | 14784440.1 | 14.10.2014 | [2016/34] | WO2014EP72001 | Priority number, date | EP20130188955 | 16.10.2013 Original published format: EP 13188955 | US201361902383P | 11.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361902383 P | [2016/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015055642 | Date: | 23.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3057629 | Date: | 24.08.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3057629 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/20, A61M5/31, A61M5/24, A61M5/315 | [2016/34] | CPC: |
A61M5/24 (EP,US);
A61M5/31563 (US);
A61M5/20 (EP,US);
A61M5/2033 (EP,US);
A61M5/31501 (EP,US);
A61M5/31528 (US);
A61M5/31551 (US);
A61M5/31553 (EP,US);
A61M5/31583 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEDIKAMENTENABGABEVORRICHTUNG MIT BREMSVORRICHTUNG | [2016/34] | English: | DRUG DELIVERY DEVICE WITH BRAKE MECHANISM | [2016/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENT AVEC MÉCANISME DE FREIN | [2021/20] |
Former [2016/34] | DISPOSITIF D'ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENT AYANT UN MÉCANISME DE FREIN | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/34] | 09.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2019 | Observations by third parties | 18.02.2019 | Observations by third parties | 26.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2020 | Observations by third parties | 24.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/46] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 20.12.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 20.12.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.01.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.10.2014 | AL | 08.12.2021 | AT | 08.12.2021 | CY | 08.12.2021 | CZ | 08.12.2021 | DK | 08.12.2021 | EE | 08.12.2021 | ES | 08.12.2021 | FI | 08.12.2021 | HR | 08.12.2021 | IT | 08.12.2021 | LT | 08.12.2021 | LV | 08.12.2021 | MC | 08.12.2021 | MK | 08.12.2021 | MT | 08.12.2021 | NL | 08.12.2021 | PL | 08.12.2021 | RO | 08.12.2021 | RS | 08.12.2021 | SE | 08.12.2021 | SI | 08.12.2021 | SK | 08.12.2021 | SM | 08.12.2021 | TR | 08.12.2021 | BG | 08.03.2022 | NO | 08.03.2022 | GR | 09.03.2022 | IS | 08.04.2022 | PT | 08.04.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 14.10.2014 | |
AL | 08.12.2021 | ||
AT | 08.12.2021 | ||
CY | 08.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
IT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
MK | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SI | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
TR | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 14.10.2014 | |
AL | 08.12.2021 | ||
AT | 08.12.2021 | ||
CY | 08.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
IT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
MK | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SI | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 14.10.2014 | |
AL | 08.12.2021 | ||
AT | 08.12.2021 | ||
CY | 08.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
IT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SI | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 14.10.2014 | |
AL | 08.12.2021 | ||
AT | 08.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
IT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SI | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 08.12.2021 | |
AT | 08.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
IT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SI | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 08.12.2021 | |
AT | 08.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SI | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 08.12.2021 | |
AT | 08.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 08.12.2021 | |
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 08.12.2021 | |
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 08.12.2021 | |
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 08.12.2021 | |
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 08.12.2021 | |
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | ES | 08.12.2021 | |
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | ES | 08.12.2021 | |
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | ES | 08.12.2021 | |
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | ES | 08.12.2021 | |
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 08.12.2021 | |
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 08.12.2021 | |
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 08.03.2022 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5480387 (GABRIEL JOCHEN [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,7,15* column 4, line 16 - column 12, line 1; figures 1-20 *; | [X]US2004215153 (GRAF RONEY [CH], et al) [X] 1-3,7,15 * column 58 - column 105; figures 1-22 *; | [X]GB2443390 (OWEN MUMFORD LTD [GB]) [X] 1,4,7,9,11,15 * page 5, line 25 - page 12, line 3; figures 1-10 *; | [XI]US2011054412 (EICH ADRIAN [CH], et al) [X] 1-3,7,8,15 * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0083]; figures 1-14 * [I] 5,6,10,12-14; | [XD]US2011077595 (EICH ADRIAN [CH], et al) [XD] 1-3,7,8,15 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0042]; figures 1-14 * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0074] * | Examination | WO2006086983 | WO2007017053 | WO2007017052 | by applicant | US5480387 | US5693027 | US2004215153 | WO2007017053 | GB2443390 | US2011054412 | US2011077595 |