EP2986795 - ARRANGEMENT FOR INDICATING THE STATE OF THE LOCK OF A DOOR WITH INDICATION LIGHTS, AND A FACE PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2021 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rollock OY Tekniikantie 12 02150 Espoo / FI | [2016/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANKKUNEN, Hannu Nokkalanniementie 15 FI-02230 Espoo / FI | [2016/08] | Representative(s) | Papula Oy P.O. Box 981 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2020/24] |
Former [2016/08] | Heinänen Oy Patent Agency Äyritie 8 D 01510 Vantaa / FI | Application number, filing date | 14785635.5 | 15.04.2014 | [2016/08] | WO2014FI50271 | Priority number, date | FI20130005381 | 17.04.2013 Original published format: FI 20135381 | [2016/08] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014170544 | Date: | 23.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2986795 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2986795 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 23.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E05B41/00, E05B17/10 | [2016/08] | CPC: |
E05B17/10 (EP,FI,US);
E05B41/00 (EP,FI,US);
E05B1/0053 (US);
E05B1/0061 (US);
E05B1/0084 (FI);
E05B15/02 (EP,FI,US);
E05B9/02 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG ZUR ANZEIGE DES ZUSTANDS EINES TÜRSCHLOSSES MIT ANZEIGELEUCHTEN UND EINER FRONTPLATTE | [2016/08] | English: | ARRANGEMENT FOR INDICATING THE STATE OF THE LOCK OF A DOOR WITH INDICATION LIGHTS, AND A FACE PLATE | [2016/08] | French: | SYSTÈME DESTINÉ À INDIQUER L'ÉTAT DE LA SERRURE D'UNE PORTE COMPORTANT DES TÉMOINS LUMINEUX ET UNE TÊTIÈRE | [2016/08] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2015 | Search fee paid | 17.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/08] | 20.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.04.2014 | AL | 10.06.2020 | AT | 10.06.2020 | CY | 10.06.2020 | CZ | 10.06.2020 | EE | 10.06.2020 | ES | 10.06.2020 | FI | 10.06.2020 | HR | 10.06.2020 | IT | 10.06.2020 | LT | 10.06.2020 | LV | 10.06.2020 | MC | 10.06.2020 | MK | 10.06.2020 | NL | 10.06.2020 | PL | 10.06.2020 | RO | 10.06.2020 | RS | 10.06.2020 | SI | 10.06.2020 | SK | 10.06.2020 | SM | 10.06.2020 | BG | 10.09.2020 | GR | 11.09.2020 | PT | 12.10.2020 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/30] | HU | 15.04.2014 | |
AL | 10.06.2020 | ||
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CY | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 15.04.2014 | |
AL | 10.06.2020 | ||
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 10.06.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4683741 (FIELDS ROY A [US]) [X] 1,5 * the whole document * [A] 2-4,6; | [XAY]US2003063009 (PELLETIER THOMAS [US], et al) [X] 5 * the whole document * [A] 6 [Y] 1-4; | [XA]US2006112747 (MOON CHARLES W [US], et al) [X] 5 * the whole document * [A] 1-4,6; | [A]US2010219957 (JOLLEY MARK W [US], et al) [A] 1-6* figures 1-5 *; | [XY]EP2447451 (DORMA GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 5,6 * paragraph [0019]; figures 5,6 * * paragraphs [0029] - [0033] * [Y] 1-4 | International search | [A]US2005248931 (ALVAREZ HEATHER [US]); | [X]US2006112747 (MOON CHARLES W [US], et al); | [A]TWI292453B (LIU LAI-FU [TW]); | [A]CN201874316U (NANTONG XINYING DESIGN SERV CO); | [A]CN202380814U (ZIZHAO JIANG) |