EP3041985 - STEAMER WITH FILTER UNIT, FILTER CARTRIDGE AND METHOD OF CONVEYING STEAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2016/28] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHUA, Hee Keng c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
CHING, Boon Khian c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
JIANG, Yong c/oHigh Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/28] | Representative(s) | Vollering, Stefanus Franciscus Maria Philips Domestic Appliances IP Department High Tech Campus 42 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2016/28] | Freeke, Arnold Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 14786283.3 | 25.08.2014 | [2016/28] | WO2014IB64043 | Priority number, date | EP20130183269 | 06.09.2013 Original published format: EP 13183269 | [2016/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015033247 | Date: | 12.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3041985 | Date: | 13.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | D06F75/10, D06F75/20, F22B1/28 | [2016/28] | CPC: |
D06F75/10 (EP,RU,US);
B01D46/00 (US);
B01D46/0002 (US);
B01D46/0041 (US);
C02F1/001 (US);
D06F75/20 (EP,US);
F22B1/28 (US);
F22B1/282 (EP,US);
F22B1/284 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/28] | Title | German: | DÄMPFER MIT FILTEREINHEIT, FILTERPATRONE UND VERFAHREN ZUR DAMPFFÖRDERUNG | [2016/28] | English: | STEAMER WITH FILTER UNIT, FILTER CARTRIDGE AND METHOD OF CONVEYING STEAM | [2016/28] | French: | CUISEUR À VAPEUR AYANT UNE UNITÉ DE FILTRE, CARTOUCHE DE FILTRE ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSFERT DE VAPEUR | [2016/28] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/28] | 03.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/52] | 18.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4087263 (SCHONMANN JR FREDI); | [A]EP0711862 (BRAUN AG [DE]); | [X]DE102004032361 (BRAUN GMBH [DE]); | [AD]WO2008075308 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [A]WO2010139599 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE], et al); | [XI]WO2013068870 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) | by applicant | WO2008075308 |