EP3060875 - CARTRIDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RUAG Ammotec GmbH Kronacher Strasse 63 90765 Fürth / DE | [2016/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GELFERT, Stephan Im Tal 11 89335 Ichenhausen / DE | [2016/35] | Representative(s) | Schmid, Nils T.F., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2019/13] |
Former [2016/35] | Uppena, Franz Chemetall GmbH Patente, Marken & Lizenzen Trakehner Strasse 3 60487 Frankfurt/Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 14787204.8 | 24.10.2014 | [2016/35] | WO2014EP72866 | Priority number, date | DE20131017672 | 25.10.2013 Original published format: DE102013017672 | [2016/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015059282 | Date: | 30.04.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3060875 | Date: | 31.08.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3060875 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F42B5/067, F42B5/02, F42B14/02 | [2016/35] | CPC: |
F42B5/067 (EP,IL,KR,US);
F42B14/02 (EP,IL,KR,US);
F42B5/025 (EP,IL,KR,US);
F42B33/00 (IL,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PATRONE | [2016/35] | English: | CARTRIDGE | [2016/35] | French: | CARTOUCHE | [2016/35] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/35] | 30.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/11] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 18.12.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 18.12.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.01.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 27.03.2019 | CY | 27.03.2019 | CZ | 27.03.2019 | EE | 27.03.2019 | ES | 27.03.2019 | IT | 27.03.2019 | LT | 27.03.2019 | LV | 27.03.2019 | MC | 27.03.2019 | MK | 27.03.2019 | MT | 27.03.2019 | PL | 27.03.2019 | RO | 27.03.2019 | RS | 27.03.2019 | SI | 27.03.2019 | SK | 27.03.2019 | SM | 27.03.2019 | TR | 27.03.2019 | BG | 27.06.2019 | GR | 28.06.2019 | IS | 27.07.2019 | PT | 27.07.2019 | AT | 24.10.2019 | IE | 24.10.2019 | LU | 24.10.2019 | BE | 31.10.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CY | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
MT | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
AT | 24.10.2019 | ||
IE | 24.10.2019 | ||
LU | 24.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CY | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
AT | 24.10.2019 | ||
IE | 24.10.2019 | ||
LU | 24.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
AT | 24.10.2019 | ||
IE | 24.10.2019 | ||
LU | 24.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
IE | 24.10.2019 | ||
LU | 24.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
LU | 24.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
LU | 24.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 27.03.2019 | |
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 27.03.2019 | |
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | IT | 27.03.2019 | |
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | LT | 27.03.2019 | |
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | LT | 27.03.2019 | |
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | LT | 27.03.2019 | |
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | LT | 27.03.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XI]GB576726 (SIEGFRIED KELLER, et al) [X] 1,3,4,6 * page 2, lines 49-68 * * figure 1 * [I] 7,8; | [X]US2872864 (BARNES GLADEON M, et al) [X] 1,3-5 * figure 1 *; | [X]US3720169 (JOHNSON T, et al) [X] 1,3,4,6* figure 1 *; | [XI]NL7203827 (NEDERL WAPEN & MUNITIE) [X] 1,3,4,6 * page 4, lines 21-32 * * figure 5 * [I] 7,8; | [X]EP2253924 (KOREA NUCLEAR ENGINEERING CO L [KR]) [X] 1,3,4 * figure 3 * |