EP3052814 - FRAC SYSTEM WITH HYDRAULIC ENERGY TRANSFER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Energy Recovery, Inc. 1717 Doolittle Drive San Leandro, California 94577 / US | [2016/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GHASRIPOOR, Farshad 1717 Doolittle Drive San Leandro, California 94577 / US | 02 /
MARTIN, Jeremy Grant 1717 Doolittle Drive San Leandro, California 94577 / US | 03 /
KRISH, Prem 1717 Doolittle Drive San Leandro, California 94577 / US | 04 /
GOBBURI, Baji 1717 Doolittle Drive San Leandro, California 94577 / US | [2016/32] | Representative(s) | Knöner, Gregor, et al Kahler Käck Mollekopf Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten mbB Vorderer Anger 239 86899 Landsberg am Lech / DE | [2020/17] |
Former [2016/32] | Käck, Stefan Kahler Käck Mollekopf Vorderer Anger 239 86899 Landsberg am Lech / DE | Application number, filing date | 14787331.9 | 03.10.2014 | [2016/32] | WO2014US59157 | Priority number, date | US201361886638P | 03.10.2013 Original published format: US 201361886638 P | US201462033080P | 04.08.2014 Original published format: US 201462033080 P | [2016/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015051316 | Date: | 09.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3052814 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3052814 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F04F13/00, E21B43/267 | [2016/32] | CPC: |
E21B43/267 (EP,CN,RU,US);
E21B43/16 (US);
E21B43/2607 (EP,CN,RU,US);
F04F13/00 (EP,CN,US);
G05D16/18 (RU)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FRAC-SYSTEM MIT HYDRAULISCHEM ENERGIEÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM | [2016/32] | English: | FRAC SYSTEM WITH HYDRAULIC ENERGY TRANSFER SYSTEM | [2016/32] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FRACTURATION AVEC SYSTÈME DE TRANSFERT D'ÉNERGIE HYDRAULIQUE | [2016/32] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/32] | 01.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.10.2014 | AL | 22.04.2020 | AT | 22.04.2020 | CY | 22.04.2020 | CZ | 22.04.2020 | EE | 22.04.2020 | ES | 22.04.2020 | FI | 22.04.2020 | HR | 22.04.2020 | IT | 22.04.2020 | LT | 22.04.2020 | LV | 22.04.2020 | MC | 22.04.2020 | MK | 22.04.2020 | MT | 22.04.2020 | NL | 22.04.2020 | RO | 22.04.2020 | RS | 22.04.2020 | SE | 22.04.2020 | SI | 22.04.2020 | SK | 22.04.2020 | SM | 22.04.2020 | TR | 22.04.2020 | BG | 22.07.2020 | GR | 23.07.2020 | IS | 22.08.2020 | PT | 24.08.2020 | IE | 03.10.2020 | LU | 03.10.2020 | BE | 31.10.2020 | FR | 31.10.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 03.10.2014 | |
AL | 22.04.2020 | ||
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CY | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
MT | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
TR | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
IE | 03.10.2020 | ||
LU | 03.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
IE | 03.10.2020 | ||
LU | 03.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
LU | 03.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
LU | 03.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
LU | 03.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 22.04.2020 | |
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 22.08.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US3560053 (ORTLOFF JOHN E) [X] 1,11 * figure 1 * * columns 1-3 * [Y] 4-6,12-14,17-20; | [Y]US2006037895 (SHUMWAY SCOTT [US]) [Y] 4-6,12-14,20 * figures 1-2 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0002] - [00 6] , [0 20] - [0022] - [0 28] , [0 31] , [0 35] *; | [A]US2011176936 (ANDREWS WILLIAM T [BM]) [A] 5,6,13,14,20 * figure 1 ** paragraphs [0002] - [0003] - [0 54] , [0 57] , [0 61] - [0063] *; | [XI]US2012217011 (DOTSON THOMAS L [US], et al) [X] 1-3,9-11 * figures 1-2, 5 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0 10] , [0012] , [0024] , [0029] - [0037] * [I] 7,8,15-19; | [XY]CA2773019 (SYNOIL FLUIDS HOLDINGS INC [CA]) [X] 17-19 * figures 17-19 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0 31] - [0036] * [Y] 17-20 | Examination | US2009301725 | - LOZIER J ET AL, "THE HYDRAULIC TURBOCHARGERTM: A NEW TYPE OF DEVICE FOR THE REDUCTION OF FEED PUMP ENERGY CONSUMPTION IN REVERSE OSMOSIS SYSTEMS", DESALINATION, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19891101), vol. 75, no. 1 / 03, doi:10.1016/0011-9164(89)85006-4, ISSN 0011-9164, pages 71 - 83, XP000201291 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0011-9164(89)85006-4 | - STOVER ET AL, "Seawater reverse osmosis with isobaric energy recovery devices", DESALINAT, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20070124), vol. 203, no. 1-3, doi:10.1016/J.DESAL.2006.03.528, ISSN 0011-9164, pages 168 - 175, XP005856949 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.desal.2006.03.528 | - John H Reif ET AL, "Solar-thermal powered desalination: Its significant challenges and potential", Renewable and Sustainable Energy Reviews, doi:10.1016/j.rser.2015.03.065, (20051114), pages 152 - 165, URL: https://www.researchgate.net/publication/267771476_ENERGY_RECOVERY_DEVICE_PERFORMANCE_ANALYSIS, (20180202), XP055447505 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.rser.2015.03.065 | - SUN J ET AL, "Energy Recovery Device with a Fluid Switcher for Seawater Reverse Osmosis System", CHINESE JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL ENGINEERING, CHEMICAL INDUSTRY PRESS, BEIJING, CN, vol. 16, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S1004-9541(08)60083-X, ISSN 1004-9541, (20080401), pages 329 - 332, (20080401), XP022856577 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1004-9541(08)60083-X | - A M Farooque ET AL, "COMPARATIVE STUDY OF VARIOUS ENERGY RECOVERY DEVICES USED IN SWRO PROCESS", (20041231), URL: http://citeseerx.ist.psu.edu/viewdoc/download?doi=10.1.1.501.5964&rep=rep1&type=pdf, (20191112), XP055641546 | - EL-GHONEMY A M K, "Waste energy recovery in seawater reverse osmosis desalination plants. Part 2: Case study", RENEWABLE AND SUSTAINABLE ENERGY REVIEWS, ELSEVIERS SCIENCE, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 16, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.RSER.2012.03.057, ISSN 1364-0321, (20120315), pages 4016 - 4028, (20120406), XP028496833 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.rser.2012.03.057 | - Zhou Yihui ET AL, "Rotary pressure exchanger for SWRO", (20110922), URL: http://cdn.intechweb.org/pdfs/20345.pdf, (20191112), XP055641639 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5772/21391 | - Mageed Jean Guirguis, "Energy Recovery Devices in Seawater Reverse Osmosis Desalination Plants with Emphasis on Efficiency and Economical Analysis of Isobaric versus Centrifugal Devices", (20111030), URL: http://scholarcommons.usf.edu/cgi/viewcontent.cgi?article=4330&context=etd, (20191112), XP055641711 |