|
22.09.2021 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2020 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2020 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2020 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.10.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.10.2020 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.07.2020 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2020 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.07.2020 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.04.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.04.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
16.04.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
06.04.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2019 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.11.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2017 |
Statement of non-availability of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2017 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.10.2017 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.10.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.10.2017 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.10.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.10.2017 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.10.2017 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2017 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2017 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
13.09.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2017 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2017 |
Invitation to file a translation of the previous application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2017 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2017 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.03.2017 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2017 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2016 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2016 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.03.2016 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
15.02.2016 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.02.2016 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2016 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
15.02.2016 |
Transmission of a document (International preliminary examination report) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2016 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2016 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.01.2016 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2016 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.01.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.01.2016 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
12.01.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
12.01.2016 |
Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.01.2016 |
Amended drawings with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.01.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.01.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
12.01.2016 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.01.2016 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.06.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
30.10.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.10.2014 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.10.2014 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
22 |