Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9540374 | Global Dossier | 10.01.2017 | B2 | US2015218163 | 06.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014KR03492 | 22.04.2014 | KR20130044498 | 22.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6275720B | Global Dossier | 07.02.2018 | B2 | JP2015532640 | 12.11.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014KR03492 | 22.04.2014 | KR20130044498 | 22.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104583209B | Global Dossier | 22.03.2017 | B | CN104583209 | 29.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014KR03492 | 22.04.2014 | KR20130044498 | 22.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2871185 | Global Dossier | 21.08.2019 | B1 | EP2871185 | 20.04.2016 | A4 | EP2871185 | 13.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014KR03492 | 22.04.2014 | KR20130044498 | 22.04.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014175627 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20130044498 | 22.04.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101607749B | Global Dossier | 30.03.2016 | B1 | KR20140126265 | 30.10.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20130044498 | 22.04.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI541242B | 11.07.2016 | B | TW201509939 | 16.03.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20130044498 | 22.04.2013 |