blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3029874

EP3029874 - UPLINK CONTROL INFORMATION SENDING METHOD, AND USER EQUIPMENT AND BASE STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.02.2025
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.07.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.06.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.12.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.02.2025New entry: Decision on request for further processing 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Advanced Standard Communication LLC
675 Town Square Blvd. Suite 200
Garland TX 75040 / US
[2025/11]
Former [2023/18]For all designated states
Advanced Standard Communication LLC
675 Town Square Blvd. Suite 200
Garland TX 75040 / US
Former [2016/23]For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / YANG, Weiwei
c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
02 / DAI, Bo
c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
03 / LIANG, Chunli
c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
04 / XIA, Shuqiang
c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
05 / FANG, Huiying
c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2016/23]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2025/11]
Former [2016/23]Awapatent AB
Junkersgatan 1
582 35 Linköping / SE
Application number, filing date14788348.222.05.2014
[2016/23]
WO2014CN78144
Priority number, dateCN20131033268701.08.2013         Original published format: CN201310332687
[2016/23]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2014173351
Date:30.10.2014
Language:ZH
[2014/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3029874
Date:08.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3029874
Date:12.03.2025
Language:EN
[2025/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN30.10.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.07.2016
ClassificationIPC:H04L5/00
[2016/23]
CPC:
H04L5/001 (EP,CN,US); H04L1/1671 (EP,RU,US); H04L5/0057 (EP,CN,US);
H04W72/21 (US); H04L1/1854 (EP,RU,US); H04L1/1861 (EP,US);
H04L5/0001 (US); H04L5/0053 (EP,US); H04L5/0055 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/1469 (EP,CN,US); H04L5/143 (EP,CN,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/23]  
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM SENDEN VON UPLINK-STEUERINFORMATIONEN SOWIE BENUTZERVORRICHTUNG UND BASISSTATION[2016/23]
English:UPLINK CONTROL INFORMATION SENDING METHOD, AND USER EQUIPMENT AND BASE STATION[2016/23]
French:PROCEDE D'ENVOI D'INFORMATIONS DE COMMANDE DE LIAISON MONTANTE, ET EQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR ET STATION DE BASE[2016/23]
Entry into regional phase01.02.2016Translation filed 
01.02.2016National basic fee paid 
01.02.2016Search fee paid 
01.02.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
01.02.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.02.2016Examination requested  [2016/23]
12.01.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.06.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.10.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.12.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.12.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.04.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.10.2023Date of oral proceedings
01.12.2023Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
05.12.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.06.2024Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
19.07.2024Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.12.2024Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
03.02.2025Fee for grant paid
03.02.2025Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.02.2025Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
03.02.2025Request for further processing filed
03.02.2025Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.02.2025Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
12.06.2024Request for further processing filed
12.06.2024Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
17.06.2024Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
26.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
14.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
24.03.2020Renewal fee patent year 07
11.05.2021Renewal fee patent year 08
13.05.2022Renewal fee patent year 09
12.05.2023Renewal fee patent year 10
29.05.2024Renewal fee patent year 11
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2012108720  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al);
 [Y]US2013028149  (CHEN WANSHI [US], et al);
 [P]US2013322343  (SEO DONG YOUN [KR], et al)
International search[A]CN101989898  (ZTE CORP);
 [A]CN102651680  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD);
 [A]WO2012124980  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.