Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
17.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] |
11.02.2019 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
17.09.2018 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
07.09.2018 | First examination report | |
13.04.2018 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.11.2017 | Change - applicant | published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] |
15.11.2017 | Change - representative | |
29.09.2017 | Change - applicant | published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
23.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant | |
04.05.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.11.2016 | Supplementary search report | published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] |
28.10.2016 | Change - classification | published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] |
28.10.2016 | Change - classification | published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] |
01.07.2016 | Change - extension states | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] |
22.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant | |
03.05.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
29.01.2016 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
29.01.2016 | Request for examination filed | published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
18.12.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.11.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.11.2015 | Change - representative | |
24.11.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.11.2014 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
31.10.2014 | PCT data prior to European publication |