Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018064816 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014CA00378 | 25.04.2014 | US201514786906 | 23.10.2015 | US201715659387 | 25.07.2017 | US201361815983 | 25.04.2013 | US201361826890 | 23.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016074519 | Global Dossier | 17.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014CA00378 | 25.04.2014 | US201361815983 | 25.04.2013 | US201361826890 | 23.05.2013 | US201414786906 | 25.04.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2988755 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2016 | A4 | EP2988755 | 02.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014CA00378 | 25.04.2014 | US201361815983 | 25.04.2013 | US201361826890 | 23.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2910325 | 30.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014CA00378 | 25.04.2014 | US201361815983 | 25.04.2013 | US201361826890 | 23.05.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014172784 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361815983 | 25.04.2013 | US201361826890 | 23.05.2013 |