EP2988755 - CROSSLINKED HYALURONIC ACID COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voronin, Andrey Alexeevich ul. Vasiliya Botyleva, 13 App. 4 Moscow 121500 / RU | [2017/51] |
Former [2017/44] | For all designated states Aluron Pharma Technologies Inc. 204 Saint-Sacrement Str. Suite 300 Montreal, QC H2Y 1W8 / CA | ||
Former [2016/09] | For all designated states Aluron Biopharma Inc. 204 Saint-Sacrement Str. Suite 300 Montreal, Québec H2Y 1W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KHABAROV, Vladimir 38/16 Komsomol'sky Ave. Apt. 84 Moscow 119146 / RU | 02 /
SELYANIN, Mikhail 6 Ostrovityanova Str. Apt. 146 Moscow 117513 / RU | 03 /
POLYAK, Felix 460 Saint-Jean Street Apt. 402 Montreal, Québec H2Y 2S1 / CA | [2016/09] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/09] | Lahrtz, Fritz Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 68 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14788611.3 | 25.04.2014 | [2016/09] | WO2014CA00378 | Priority number, date | US201361815983P | 25.04.2013 Original published format: US 201361815983 P | US201361826890P | 23.05.2013 Original published format: US 201361826890 P | [2016/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014172784 | Date: | 30.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2988755 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 30.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/728, A61K31/19, A61K31/198, A61K31/375, A61K31/519, A61K38/06, A61K8/365, A61K8/41, A61K8/64, A61K8/67, A61K8/73, A61L27/20, A61L27/52, A61P17/00, A61P19/02, A61Q19/08, C08B37/08, C08J3/24 | [2016/09] | CPC: |
A61L27/20 (EP,US);
A61K47/36 (US);
A61K31/194 (EP,US);
A61K31/198 (EP,US);
A61K31/205 (EP,US);
A61K31/375 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K31/728 (EP,US);
A61K38/06 (EP,US);
A61K8/362 (US);
A61K8/41 (US);
A61K8/673 (US);
A61K8/676 (US);
A61K8/735 (EP,US);
A61L27/54 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61Q19/08 (EP,US);
C08B37/0072 (EP,US);
C08L5/08 (US);
A61K2800/40 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/198, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/205, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/375, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/519, A61K2300/00 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/09] | Title | German: | VERNETZTE HYALURONSÄUREZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2016/09] | English: | CROSSLINKED HYALURONIC ACID COMPOSITIONS | [2016/09] | French: | COMPOSITIONS D'ACIDE HYALURONIQUE RÉTICULÉES | [2016/09] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2015 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/09] | 26.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/25] | 12.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2007014784 (FIDIA FARMACEUTICI [IT], et al) [I] 1-14* page 9, lines 17-25 *; | [I]WO2012167079 (ALLERGAN INC [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * page 4, line 30 - page 21, line 27 * * page 22, line 11 - page 27, line 8 * * page 26, line 20; examples 2,4,14-17 *; | [A]EP2570118 (UNIV CHINA MEDICAL [TW]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0021] , [0037] * | International search | [X]RU2382050 (INST SINT POLIMERNYKH MATERIAL [RU], et al); | [X]RU2382052 (INST SINT POLIMERNYKH MATERIAL [RU], et al); | [X]RU2386641 (INST SINT POLIMERNYKH MATERIALOV ISPM IM N S ENIKOLOPOVA RAN [RU], et al); | [X]RU2386640 (INST SINT POLIMERNYKH MATERIALOV ISPM IM N S ENIKOLOPOVA RAN [RU], et al); | [X]WO2013040242 (ALLERGAN INC [US], et al); | [X] - "HYALREPAIR BIOREPARANTS", MARTINEX, (20120804), URL: www.martinex.ru/products/biorepair/hyalrepair02.html, XP055289874 |