EP2991392 - COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD, USER TERMINAL, CELLULAR BASE STATION, AND ACCESS POINT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.10.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyocera Corporation 6, Takedatobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2016/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORITA, Kugo c/o KYOCERA Corporation Head Office 6 Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-Ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2016/09] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/09] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14789001.6 | 14.04.2014 | [2016/09] | WO2014JP60593 | Priority number, date | JP20130092181 | 25.04.2013 Original published format: JP 2013092181 | [2016/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014175091 | Date: | 30.10.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2991392 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/06, H04W36/14, H04W36/22, H04W84/12, H04W88/06, H04W92/20 | [2016/09] | CPC: |
H04W36/22 (EP,US);
H04W12/069 (EP,US);
H04W76/11 (EP,US);
H04L2101/622 (US);
H04W36/1446 (EP,US);
H04W84/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/09] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN, BENUTZERENDGERÄT, ZELLULARE BASISSTATION UND ZUGANGSPUNKT | [2016/09] | English: | COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD, USER TERMINAL, CELLULAR BASE STATION, AND ACCESS POINT | [2016/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE COMMUNICATION, TERMINAL D'UTILISATEUR, STATION DE BASE CELLULAIRE ET POINT D'ACCÈS | [2016/09] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2015 | Translation filed | 03.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2015 | Search fee paid | 03.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/09] | 09.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/45] | 12.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/45] | Divisional application(s) | EP17169496.1 / EP3220673 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2010057527 (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH [DE], et al); | [XA]US2011223885 (SALKINTZIS APOSTOLIS K [GR], et al); | [A]US2011222523 (FU I-KANG [TW], et al); | [XI]WO2011157152 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al); | [P]EP2688363 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) | International search | [A]JP2007235494 (NEC CORP); | [A]JP2010034945 (KYOCERA CORP); |