EP3009008 - CEREAL CONTAINING HERICIUM ERINACEUM AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lee, Dae-Hee 101-1307 22 Mochung-ro 26beon-gil Heungdeok-gu Cheongju-si, Chungcheongbuk-do 361-805 / KR | [2016/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2016/16] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/16] | Tischner, Oliver Lavoix Munich Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14789067.7 | 27.02.2014 | [2016/16] | WO2014KR01636 | Priority number, date | KR20130046424 | 26.04.2013 Original published format: KR 20130046424 | [2016/16] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014175545 | Date: | 30.10.2014 | Language: | KO | [2014/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3009008 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 30.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A23L7/10, A23L31/00, A23L33/10, A21D2/08, A21D8/02, A21D13/00, A61K36/07 | [2016/16] | CPC: |
A61K36/07 (EP,US);
A23L11/00 (KR);
A23L29/30 (EP,US);
A23L31/00 (EP,US);
A23L33/10 (EP,US);
A23L7/00 (EP,US);
A23L7/101 (EP,US);
A23L7/122 (EP,US);
A23L7/135 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/16] | Title | German: | GETREIDE ENTHALTEN HERICIUM ERINACEUM UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2016/16] | English: | CEREAL CONTAINING HERICIUM ERINACEUM AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME | [2016/16] | French: | CÉRÉALE CONTENANT HERICIUM ERINACEUM ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRODUIRE | [2016/16] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2015 | Translation filed | 25.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2015 | Search fee paid | 25.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/16] | 18.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/11] | 05.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.03.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]KR20080063456 (HANABIOTECH LTD [KR]) [X] 1-3,5 * abstract * [I] 6,7,11,12; | [XI]CN1428084 ; | [X]WO2004032646 (YOON SOOK-JA [KR]) [X] 1,2,4 * claim 14 * | [XI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2003, no. 77, Database accession no. 2003-814115, XP002755257 & CN1428084 A 20030709 (SHEN M) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * [I] 6-15 | International search | [X]KR20010069431 (NC BIOTEC COM [KR]); | [Y]KR20100108112 (JEOLLANAMDO [KR]); | [Y]KR100899531B (CHOI DONG HUN [KR]); | [A]JP2000166499 (KOUFUKU FOODS KK) | by applicant | - International Medicinal Mushroom Research Society, WASEDA PUBLISHING CO., LTD. |