EP3036007 - CANCER TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc. 2200 Pennsylvania Avenue NW Suite 300 Washington, DC 20037 / US | [2016/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POLYMEROPOULOS, Mihael, H. 10627 Rivers Bend Lane Potomac, MD 20854 / US | 02 /
LICAMELE, Louis, William 2270 Dunster Lane Potomac, MD 20854 / US | 03 /
LAVEDAN, Christian 22 Eldwick Court Potomac, MD 20854 / US | [2016/26] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2016/26] | Application number, filing date | 14789436.4 | 22.08.2014 | [2016/26] | WO2014US52209 | Priority number, date | US201361869039P | 22.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361869039 P | [2016/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015027121 | Date: | 26.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3036007 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3036007 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/165, A61K9/00, A61K9/08, A61K9/10, A61K9/48, A61K9/107, A61P35/00 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61K31/165 (EP,KR,US);
C07K16/2866 (US);
A61K9/0053 (EP,US);
A61K9/0095 (EP,US);
A61K9/08 (EP,US);
A61K9/10 (EP,US);
A61K9/107 (EP,US);
A61K9/48 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (US);
A61K38/00 (US);
C07K2317/21 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/24] | A61K31/165, A61K9/00, A61K9/08, A61K9/10, A61K9/48, A61K9/107 | ||
Former IPC [2016/26] | A61P35/00, A61K31/165 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KREBSBEHANDLUNG | [2016/26] | English: | CANCER TREATMENT | [2016/26] | French: | TRAITEMENT CONTRE LE CANCER | [2016/26] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/26] | 28.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19201777.0 / EP3616754 | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.08.2014 | AL | 09.10.2019 | AT | 09.10.2019 | CY | 09.10.2019 | CZ | 09.10.2019 | DK | 09.10.2019 | EE | 09.10.2019 | FI | 09.10.2019 | HR | 09.10.2019 | LT | 09.10.2019 | LV | 09.10.2019 | MC | 09.10.2019 | MK | 09.10.2019 | MT | 09.10.2019 | NL | 09.10.2019 | PL | 09.10.2019 | RO | 09.10.2019 | RS | 09.10.2019 | SE | 09.10.2019 | SI | 09.10.2019 | SK | 09.10.2019 | SM | 09.10.2019 | TR | 09.10.2019 | BG | 09.01.2020 | NO | 09.01.2020 | GR | 10.01.2020 | IS | 09.02.2020 | PT | 10.02.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 22.08.2014 | |
AL | 09.10.2019 | ||
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CY | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
MT | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
TR | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 09.10.2019 | |
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 09.10.2019 | |
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 09.10.2019 | |
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 09.10.2019 | |
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NL | 09.10.2019 | |
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | NL | 09.10.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0196415 (BEPPU TERUHIKO [JP]) [X] 1-9,19,20,22-25 * example - *; | [XY]WO02060430 (CORNELL RES FOUNDATION INC [US]) [X] 1-9,19-25 * example 2; claim - * [Y] 10-18; | [XY] - LIMEI LIU ET AL, "Trichostatin A Affects Breast Cancer Cell Viability by Modulating Fhit and Survivin Expression", BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING AND BIOTECHNOLOGY (ICBEB), 2012 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20120528), doi:10.1109/ICBEB.2012.457, ISBN 978-1-4577-1987-5, pages 1133 - 1135, XP032207903 [X] 1-9 * page 1133 * [Y] 10-18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/iCBEB.2012.457 | [XY] - VIGUSHIN, "Trichostatin A is a histone deacetylase inhibitor with potent antitumor activity against breast cancer in vivo", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, (20010101), XP055152712 [X] 1-9 * page 971 * [Y] 10-18 | [Y] - JUNG-HYUN PARK ET AL, "Inhibitors of histone deacetylases induce tumor-selective cytotoxicity through modulating Aurora-A kinase", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR MEDICINE, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20070913), vol. 86, no. 1, ISSN 1432-1440, pages 117 - 128, XP019576405 [Y] 10-18 * page 125 - page 127 * | [Y] - X WANG ET AL, "Overexpression of aurora kinase A in mouse mammary epithelium induces genetic instability preceding mammary tumor formation", ONCOGENE, (20060522), vol. 25, no. 54, doi:10.1038/sj.onc.1209707, ISSN 0950-9232, pages 7148 - 7158, XP055152985 [Y] 10-18 * page 7156 - page 7157 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1209707 |