EP3200632 - ELECTRONIC NICOTINE DELIVERY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2024/19] |
Former [2017/32] | For all designated states Fertin Pharma A/S Dandyvej 19 7100 Vejle / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIELSEN, Bruno Provstgaard Johannebjergparken 64 DK-7120 Vejle Øst / DK | [2017/32] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/23] | Patentgruppen A/S Aaboulevarden 31, 4th Floor 8000 Aarhus C / DK | ||
Former [2017/32] | Patentgruppen A/S Aaboulevarden 31, 4 8000 Aarhus C / DK | Application number, filing date | 14789516.3 | 03.10.2014 | [2017/32] | WO2014DK50313 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016050245 | Date: | 07.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3200632 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3200632 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/40, A24F40/30, A24F40/10, A24B15/167 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
A24F40/30 (EP,US);
A24F40/40 (EP,US);
A61M11/044 (US);
A61M15/0021 (US);
A24F40/10 (EP,US);
A61M11/04 (US);
A61M15/0001 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/46] | A24F40/30, A24F40/40 | ||
Former IPC [2017/32] | A24F47/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHES NIKOTINABGABESYSTEM | [2017/32] | English: | ELECTRONIC NICOTINE DELIVERY SYSTEM | [2017/32] | French: | SYSTÈME ÉLECTRONIQUE D'ADMINISTRATION DE NICOTINE | [2017/32] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/32] | 12.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23176970.4 / EP4233570 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.03.2024
08.03.2024
ADMISSIBLE Nicoventures Holdings Limited Globe House 1 Water Street London WC2R 3LA / GB Opponent's representative D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [2024/16] | 22.03.2024 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | NO | 07.09.2023 | |
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | NO | 07.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2013116558 (ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES INC [US], et al); | [Y]US2014060556 (LIU QIUMING [CN]); | [XY]DE202013105420U (NICOTINE TECHNOLOGY INC E [US]); | [X]US2014166028 (FUISZ RICHARD C [US], et al); | [A]US2014261488 (TUCKER CHRISTOPHER S [US]) | Opposition | US4579858 | WO03055486 | EP1618803 | WO2006070288 | US2012048266 | WO2013152873 | US2014261486 | WO2015006465 | WO2015167629 |