EP2999811 - APPARATUS FOR STRETCHING ACRYLIC FIBERS IN A PRESSURIZED STEAM ENVIRONMENT AND AUTOMATIC FIBER DRAWING-IN DEVICE FOR SAID APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M.A.E. S.p.A. Via Bolzoni 51/53 29122 Piacenza / IT | [2016/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROVELLINI, Marco Viale Pubblico Passeggio 46 I-29100 Piacenza / IT | [2016/13] | Representative(s) | Faggioni, Marco, et al Fumero S.r.l. Pettenkoferstrasse 20/22 80336 München / DE | [2016/13] | Application number, filing date | 14789869.6 | 20.05.2014 | [2016/13] | WO2014IB61562 | Priority number, date | IT2013MI00821 | 21.05.2013 Original published format: IT MI20130821 | [2016/13] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014188341 | Date: | 27.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2999811 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2999811 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | D06B17/00, D06B23/14, D06B23/18, D06C3/00, D06C7/00, D02J1/22, D02J13/00 | [2016/45] | CPC: |
D02J1/225 (EP,US);
D02J1/22 (RU);
D02J1/222 (EP,US);
D02J13/001 (EP,US);
D06B17/00 (EP,US);
D06B23/14 (EP,US);
D06B23/16 (EP);
D06B23/18 (US);
D06C3/00 (EP,US);
D06C7/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/13] | D02J1/22, D02J13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM STRECKEN VON ACRYLFASERN IN EINER UNTER DRUCK STEHENDEN DAMPFUMGEBUNG UND AUTOMATISCHE FASEREINZIEHEINRICHTUNG FÜR BESAGTE VORRICHTUNG | [2016/13] | English: | APPARATUS FOR STRETCHING ACRYLIC FIBERS IN A PRESSURIZED STEAM ENVIRONMENT AND AUTOMATIC FIBER DRAWING-IN DEVICE FOR SAID APPARATUS | [2016/13] | French: | APPAREIL D'ÉTIRAGE DE FIBRES ACRYLIQUES DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT DE VAPEUR SOUS PRESSION ET DISPOSITIF D'ÉTIRAGE AUTOMATIQUE POUR L'APPAREIL | [2016/13] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/13] | 04.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.05.2014 | AL | 19.04.2017 | AT | 19.04.2017 | CY | 19.04.2017 | CZ | 19.04.2017 | DK | 19.04.2017 | EE | 19.04.2017 | ES | 19.04.2017 | FI | 19.04.2017 | HR | 19.04.2017 | LT | 19.04.2017 | LV | 19.04.2017 | MC | 19.04.2017 | MK | 19.04.2017 | NL | 19.04.2017 | PL | 19.04.2017 | PT | 19.04.2017 | RO | 19.04.2017 | RS | 19.04.2017 | SE | 19.04.2017 | SI | 19.04.2017 | SK | 19.04.2017 | SM | 19.04.2017 | TR | 19.04.2017 | IE | 20.05.2017 | LU | 20.05.2017 | MT | 20.05.2017 | BE | 31.05.2017 | CH | 31.05.2017 | LI | 31.05.2017 | BG | 19.07.2017 | NO | 19.07.2017 | GR | 20.07.2017 | IS | 19.08.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 20.05.2014 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CY | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
MK | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PT | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
TR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IE | 20.05.2017 | ||
LU | 20.05.2017 | ||
MT | 20.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 20.05.2014 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CY | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
MK | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
TR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IE | 20.05.2017 | ||
LU | 20.05.2017 | ||
MT | 20.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 20.05.2014 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CY | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
MK | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
IE | 20.05.2017 | ||
LU | 20.05.2017 | ||
MT | 20.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HU | 20.05.2014 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CY | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
IE | 20.05.2017 | ||
LU | 20.05.2017 | ||
MT | 20.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 20.05.2014 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
IE | 20.05.2017 | ||
LU | 20.05.2017 | ||
MT | 20.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
IE | 20.05.2017 | ||
LU | 20.05.2017 | ||
MT | 20.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
IE | 20.05.2017 | ||
LU | 20.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
IE | 20.05.2017 | ||
LU | 20.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
LU | 20.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
SM | 19.04.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RS | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 19.04.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2623671 (MONSANTO CO) [A] 1-25* page 4, line 3 - page 7, line 14; figures 1,2; claims 1-3 *; | [A]US4641504 (RUNKEL WALTER [DE], et al) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1061163 (UBE NITTO KASEI CO [JP]) [A] 1-25 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2008214795 | JP2008240203 | JP2009256820 | WO2012108230 | KR20120090126 | WO2012120962 |