EP3014172 - INDIRECT LIGHTING DEVICE FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE TAIL LIGHT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marelli Automotive Lighting France 9 Rue Albert Berner 89330 Saint-Julien-du-Sault / FR | [2023/28] |
Former [2020/35] | For all designated states Marelli Automotive Lighting France 9 Rue Albert Berner 89330 Saint-Julien-du-Sault / FR | ||
Former [2016/18] | For all designated states AUTOMOTIVE LIGHTING REAR LAMPS FRANCE 9, rue Albert Berner 89330 Saint-Julien-du-Sault / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUISSON, Alain 5-7 Rue Albert Einstein F-78190 Trappes / FR | 02 /
FICHOT, Yves 5/7 Rue Albert Einstein F-78190 Trappes / FR | 03 /
SORNIN, Aurélie 5/7 Rue Albert Einstein F-78190 Trappes / FR | [2023/28] |
Former [2016/18] | 01 /
BUISSON, Alain 5-7 Rue Albert Einstein F-78190 Trappes / FR | ||
02 /
FICHOT, Yves 5/7 Rue Albert Einstein F-78190 Trappes / FR | |||
03 /
SORNIN, Aurélie co/ARLF 5/7 Rue Albert Einstein F-78190 Trappes / FR | Representative(s) | Jacobacci Coralis Harle 32, rue de l'Arcade 75008 Paris / FR | [2023/28] |
Former [2016/18] | Le Cacheux, Samuel L.R. Jacobacci & Partners 15 cours Aristide Briand 69300 Caluire-et-Cuire / FR | Application number, filing date | 14790119.3 | 30.06.2014 | [2016/18] | WO2014FR51676 | Priority number, date | FR20130001537 | 28.06.2013 Original published format: FR 1301537 | [2016/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014207414 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/53] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3014172 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3014172 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F21S43/33, F21S43/14, F21S43/20, F21S43/40 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
F21S43/40 (EP);
F21S43/14 (EP);
F21S43/26 (EP);
F21S43/31 (EP);
F21S43/33 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/50] | F21S43/33, F21S43/20, F21S43/14 | ||
Former IPC [2016/18] | F21S8/10, F21V5/00, F21V7/04, F21V13/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INDIREKTBELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUGRÜCKLICHT | [2016/18] | English: | INDIRECT LIGHTING DEVICE FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE TAIL LIGHT | [2016/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF A ÉCLAIRAGE INDIRECT POUR FEU ARRIÈRE DE VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2016/18] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/18] | 27.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.07.2023 | CZ | 12.07.2023 | DK | 12.07.2023 | EE | 12.07.2023 | ES | 12.07.2023 | FI | 12.07.2023 | HR | 12.07.2023 | IT | 12.07.2023 | LT | 12.07.2023 | LV | 12.07.2023 | NL | 12.07.2023 | RO | 12.07.2023 | RS | 12.07.2023 | SE | 12.07.2023 | SI | 12.07.2023 | SK | 12.07.2023 | SM | 12.07.2023 | NO | 12.10.2023 | GR | 13.10.2023 | IS | 12.11.2023 | PT | 13.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 12.07.2023 | |
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 12.07.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0632228 (VALEO VISION [FR]) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [I]US2003035296 (NATSUME KAZUNORI [JP], et al) [I] 1,3,5,7,9-11 * paragraphs [0032] - [0061]; figures 1-10 *; | [I]US2011317442 (MAKIUCHI KAZUYA [JP], et al) [I] 1-12,14 * paragraphs [0021] - [0066]; figures 1-5 *; | [IY]US2012163031 (OKADA HIDETAKA [JP], et al) [I] 1-12,14 * page 1 - page 4; figures 1-6 * [Y] 13; | [Y]EP2535637 (SKODA AUTO AS [CZ]) [Y] 13 * paragraphs [0005] , [0 16]; figures 1-6 * | Examination | US2011128751 | by applicant | FR2819040 | DE10101795 | DE10311317 | FR2868506 | FR20120000270 |