EP3068245 - MOUTHPIECE FOR SMOKING ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.09.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R. J. Reynolds Tobacco Company 950 Reynolds Boulevard Winston-Salem, NC 27102 / US | [2016/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAPMAN, Paul S. 410 Palace Drive Winston-salem, NC 27107 / US | 02 /
OGLESBY, Robert L. 1259 Old Salem Road Kernersville, NC 27284 / US | 03 /
JONES, Wesley S. 631 Grove Park Lane Lexington, NC 27295 / US | 04 /
LIN, Kenneth Shou-Chein 2890 Duarte Road San Marino, CA 91108 / US | 05 /
AMON, Moris 2201 Acacia Park Drive Apt. 620 Cleveland, OH 44124-3842 / US | 06 /
HEYDARPOUR, Ramin 9624 Heather Road Beverly Hills, CA 90210-1754 / US | [2016/38] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/38] | Application number, filing date | 14790405.6 | 01.10.2014 | [2016/38] | WO2014US58568 | Priority number, date | US201314076807 | 11.11.2013 Original published format: US201314076807 | [2016/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015069392 | Date: | 14.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3068245 | Date: | 21.09.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3068245 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/40 | [2021/35] | CPC: |
A24F40/40 (EP,US);
A24F40/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/38] | A24F47/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MUNDSTÜCK FÜR RAUCHARTIKEL | [2016/38] | English: | MOUTHPIECE FOR SMOKING ARTICLE | [2016/38] | French: | EMBOUT BUCCAL POUR ARTICLE À FUMER | [2016/38] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/38] | 15.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.11.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.10.2014 | AL | 16.02.2022 | AT | 16.02.2022 | CY | 16.02.2022 | CZ | 16.02.2022 | DK | 16.02.2022 | EE | 16.02.2022 | ES | 16.02.2022 | FI | 16.02.2022 | HR | 16.02.2022 | LT | 16.02.2022 | LV | 16.02.2022 | MC | 16.02.2022 | MK | 16.02.2022 | MT | 16.02.2022 | NL | 16.02.2022 | PL | 16.02.2022 | RO | 16.02.2022 | RS | 16.02.2022 | SE | 16.02.2022 | SI | 16.02.2022 | SK | 16.02.2022 | SM | 16.02.2022 | BG | 16.05.2022 | NO | 16.05.2022 | GR | 17.05.2022 | IS | 16.06.2022 | PT | 16.06.2022 | IE | 01.10.2022 | LU | 01.10.2022 | BE | 31.10.2022 | CH | 31.10.2022 | LI | 31.10.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 01.10.2014 | |
AL | 16.02.2022 | ||
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CY | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
MK | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IE | 01.10.2022 | ||
LU | 01.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 01.10.2014 | |
AL | 16.02.2022 | ||
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CY | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IE | 01.10.2022 | ||
LU | 01.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 01.10.2014 | |
AL | 16.02.2022 | ||
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IE | 01.10.2022 | ||
LU | 01.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IE | 01.10.2022 | ||
LU | 01.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
LU | 01.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
LU | 01.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
LU | 01.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 16.02.2022 | |
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 16.02.2022 | |
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 16.02.2022 | |
NO | 16.05.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2010319686 (SCHENNUM STEVEN MICHAEL [US]) [A] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [X]US2011277760 (TERRY NATHAN ANDREW [US], et al) [X] 1,3,8,22,26 * the whole document *; | [AD]US2013167849 (ADEME BALAGER [US], et al) [AD] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2013148810 (REYNOLDS TOBACCO CO R [US]) [A] 1-27* the whole document * | Examination | US2008197540 | US2012312313 | US2013199550 | US2013247924 | by applicant | US4735217 | US4793365 | US4922901 | US4947874 | US4947875 | US5060671 | US5093894 | US5101839 | US5224498 | US5228460 | US5249586 | US5261424 | US5322075 | US5353813 | US5372148 | US5388594 | US5468936 | US5469871 | US5498850 | US5498855 | US5530225 | US5573692 | US5591368 | US5659656 | US5665262 | US5666977 | WO9857556 | US5934289 | US5954979 | US5967148 | US6040560 | US6053176 | US6164287 | US6196218 | US6772756 | US6803545 | US6810883 | US6854461 | US7040314 | US2006196518 | US2007215167 | US7293565 | US2008149118 | US7513253 | US2009095311 | US2009126745 | US2009188490 | US2009260641 | US2009260642 | US2009272379 | WO2010003480 | US2010028766 | US2010024834 | US2010108081 | US2010108084 | US7726320 | US2010163063 | US2010186757 | WO2010091593 | US7789089 | US7832410 | US2010307518 | US7896006 | US8079371 | US2012067360 | US8156944 | US2013008457 | US8375957 | US8402976 | US2013167849 | US2013255702 |