EP2992425 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR MONITORING ROADWAY PARAMETERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diamond, Maxim Sokol 141 Colabaugh Pond Road Croton On Hudson, NY 10520 / US | [2016/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2016/10] | Representative(s) | Mozzi, Matteo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | [2016/10] | Application number, filing date | 14791306.5 | 30.04.2014 | [2016/10] | WO2014US36203 | Priority number, date | US201361817357P | 30.04.2013 Original published format: US 201361817357 P | [2016/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014179481 | Date: | 06.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2992425 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.11.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/00, G01C21/00 | [2016/46] | CPC: |
G06Q10/20 (EP,US);
G01N19/08 (US);
E01C23/01 (EP,US);
G01P15/00 (US);
G01S19/13 (US);
G06Q50/40 (EP,US);
G08G1/0112 (EP,US);
G08G1/012 (EP,US);
G08G1/0133 (EP,US);
G08G1/0141 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/10] | G06F11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG VON FAHRBAHNPARAMETERN | [2016/10] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR MONITORING ROADWAY PARAMETERS | [2016/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES PERMETTANT DE SURVEILLER DES PARAMÈTRES DE CHAUSSÉE | [2016/10] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2015 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/10] | 10.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.10.2018 | 01.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 12.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/37] | 09.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2003033071 (KAWASAKI HIROAKI [JP]) [I] 13* abstract *; | [I]EP1566665 (HARMAN BECKER AUTOMOTIVE SYS [DE]) [I] 1-20 * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] , [0 48] , [0 50] *; | [I]US2008024323 (KADABA NAGESH [US]) [I] 1-20 * paragraphs [0023] - [0029] - [035 ] - [0040] - [0053] , [0058] *; | [I]US2010324781 (GAGLIANO CHARLES J [US]) [I] 1-20 * paragraphs [0022] , [0023] * | International search | [X]US2007008090 (GERTSCH JAMIE [US], et al); | [Y]US2011052042 (BEN TZVI JACOB [IL]); | [Y]US2013016106 (YIP DENNIS [US], et al) |