EP2993004 - DECORATIVE-MATERIAL TRIMMING DEVICE, AND COATED-ARTICLE PRODUCTION DEVICE AND PRODUCTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KATOMOKUZAI KOGYO CO., LTD 6, aza-Hirabuchi Shinkai-cho Kasugai-shi Aichi 486-0902 / JP | [2016/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO Hisaya c/o KATOMOKUZAI KOGYO CO. LTD. 105-10 aza-Futatsuiri Yotsuya-cho Kasugai-shi Aichi 486-0909 / JP | [2016/10] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2016/10] | Application number, filing date | 14791353.7 | 30.04.2014 | [2016/10] | WO2014JP62021 | Priority number, date | JP20130097106 | 02.05.2013 Original published format: JP 2013097106 | JP20130184434 | 05.09.2013 Original published format: JP 2013184434 | [2016/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014178413 | Date: | 06.11.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2993004 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2993004 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.11.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B27M1/00, B23C3/12 | [2016/10] | CPC: |
B27D5/006 (EP,KR,US);
B23C3/12 (EP,KR,US);
B27G11/00 (KR);
B27M1/02 (KR);
B27M1/08 (KR);
B23C2220/16 (US);
B23C2220/40 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRIMMVORRICHTUNG FÜR DEKORMATERIAL UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BESCHICHTETEN ARTIKELS UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2016/10] | English: | DECORATIVE-MATERIAL TRIMMING DEVICE, AND COATED-ARTICLE PRODUCTION DEVICE AND PRODUCTION METHOD | [2016/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉBAVURAGE POUR BOIS RABOTÉ, ET DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION AINSI QUE DE FABRICATION D'ARTICLE REVÊTU | [2016/10] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2015 | Translation filed | 27.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 27.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/10] | 20.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.04.2014 | AL | 26.12.2018 | AT | 26.12.2018 | CY | 26.12.2018 | CZ | 26.12.2018 | DK | 26.12.2018 | EE | 26.12.2018 | ES | 26.12.2018 | FI | 26.12.2018 | HR | 26.12.2018 | LT | 26.12.2018 | LV | 26.12.2018 | MC | 26.12.2018 | MK | 26.12.2018 | MT | 26.12.2018 | NL | 26.12.2018 | PL | 26.12.2018 | RO | 26.12.2018 | RS | 26.12.2018 | SE | 26.12.2018 | SI | 26.12.2018 | SK | 26.12.2018 | SM | 26.12.2018 | TR | 26.12.2018 | BG | 26.03.2019 | NO | 26.03.2019 | GR | 27.03.2019 | IS | 26.04.2019 | PT | 26.04.2019 | BE | 30.04.2019 | CH | 30.04.2019 | GB | 30.04.2019 | IE | 30.04.2019 | LI | 30.04.2019 | LU | 30.04.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 30.04.2014 | |
AL | 26.12.2018 | ||
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CY | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
MT | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
GB | 30.04.2019 | ||
IE | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
LU | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 30.04.2014 | |
AL | 26.12.2018 | ||
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CY | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
GB | 30.04.2019 | ||
IE | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
LU | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CY | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
GB | 30.04.2019 | ||
IE | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
LU | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
GB | 30.04.2019 | ||
IE | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
LU | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
GB | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
LU | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
GB | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
LU | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
LU | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 26.12.2018 | |
NO | 26.03.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1050389 (HOMAG MASCHINENBAU AG [DE]) [X] 1,4-7 * abstract * * paragraph [0032] * * claim 5 * * figure - *; | [X]EP1764198 (LEDERMANN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,3* the whole document *; | [X]EP2191948 (HOMAG HOLZBEARBEITUNGSSYSTEME [DE]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0028] * * figure - *; | [X]EP2392438 (HOMAG HOLZBEARBEITUNGSSYSTEME [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document * | International search | [X]JPH0294017U (NITTO KOHKI CO., LTD.); | [X]JPH02224910 (OMI KOGYO KK); | [Y]JP2010208269 (IBIKEN KK); | [Y]JP2011152640 (PANASONIC ELEC WORKS CO LTD) | by applicant | JPH0890504 | JP2010208269 |