EP2991891 - SUSPENSION SYSTEM FOR TRACKED VEHICLES AND A TRACKED VEHICLE WITH A SUSPENSION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.2019 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.04.2019 [2019/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bae Systems Hägglunds Aktiebolag 891 82 Örnsköldsvik / SE | [2016/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VIGSTÅL, Hans Bergfinkvägen 17 S-891 40 Örnsköldsvik / SE | [2016/10] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/10] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 14791592.0 | 23.04.2014 | [2016/10] | WO2014SE50485 | Priority number, date | SE20130050524 | 29.04.2013 Original published format: SE 1350524 | [2016/10] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014178772 | Date: | 06.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2991891 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 06.11.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B62D55/108, B60G3/20, B60G3/14, B60G7/00, B60G7/04, B60G11/24, B60G99/00, B62D55/15, F16F15/08, F16F1/48 | [2016/51] | CPC: |
B60G7/001 (EP);
B62D55/108 (SE);
B60G11/24 (EP);
B60G3/14 (EP);
B60G3/207 (EP,SE);
B60G7/04 (EP);
B60G99/004 (EP);
B62D55/1083 (EP);
B62D55/15 (EP);
F16F1/48 (EP);
F16F15/08 (EP);
B60G2200/132 (EP);
B60G2202/13 (EP);
B60G2202/1424 (EP);
B60G2202/144 (EP);
B60G2204/122 (EP);
B60G2204/125 (EP);
B60G2204/14 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2016/10] | B62D55/108, B60G3/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/10] | Title | German: | FEDERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR RAUPENFAHRZEUGE UND RAUPENFAHRZEUG MIT EINEM FEDERUNGSSYSTEM | [2016/10] | English: | SUSPENSION SYSTEM FOR TRACKED VEHICLES AND A TRACKED VEHICLE WITH A SUSPENSION SYSTEM | [2016/10] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SUSPENSION POUR DES VÉHICULES À CHENILLES ET VÉHICULE À CHENILLES DOTÉ D'UN SYSTÈME DE SUSPENSION | [2016/10] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/10] | 31.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/14] | 13.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]EP0937634 (VXO GROUP INTERNATIONAL AG [LI]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-6,8 [I] 7,9; | [XAI]US2967075 (EDWARD CHRISTIE JOHN) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-6,8 [I] 7,9; | [XAI]WO2006074559 (WENKO AG [CH], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-6,8 [I] 7,9; | [XAI]US2779636 (ALLEN RAYMOND W) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-6,8 [I] 7,9; | [A]SE511665 (HAEGGLUNDS VEHICLE AB [SE]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9854017 (NEWAY ANCHORLOK INT INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | International search | [X]EP0937634 (VXO GROUP INTERNATIONAL AG); | [X]US2967075 (EDWARD CHRISTIE JOHN); | [X]WO2006074559 (WENKO AG ET AL); | [X]US2779636 (ALLEN RAYMOND W); | [A]SE511665 (HAEGGLUNDS VEHICLE AB); | [A]WO9854017 (NEWAY ANCHORLOK INT INC) |