EP2981130 - COMMUNICATION MANAGING METHOD AND COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2016/05] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIANG, Qiandeng c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
YOU, Jianjie c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Shuyi c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 04 /
ZHU, Huaxing c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2016/05] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/05] | Awapatent AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | Application number, filing date | 14792265.2 | 11.04.2014 | [2016/05] | WO2014CN75159 | Priority number, date | CN201310155598 | 28.04.2013 Original published format: CN201310155598 | [2016/05] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014176964 | Date: | 06.11.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2981130 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.11.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/10, H04L29/06, H04W12/06 | [2016/16] | CPC: |
H04L63/0892 (EP,US);
H04L63/105 (US);
H04W12/062 (EP,US);
H04W12/068 (EP,US);
H04L12/1407 (EP,US);
H04L12/1467 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/05] | H04W28/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/05] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVERWALTUNGSVERFAHREN UND KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2016/05] | English: | COMMUNICATION MANAGING METHOD AND COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2016/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DE COMMUNICATION ET SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION | [2016/05] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2015 | Translation filed | 26.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/05] | 05.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/47] | 16.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2006118497 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1-7,9-14 * page 12, line 6 - page 13, line 18; figures 1,3a * * page 14, line 13 - line 15 * * page 15, line 23 - page 20, line 16 * [I] 8,15; | [XI]US2009054037 (KAIPPALLIMALIL JOHN [US]) [X] 1-6,9-13 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0023]; figures 1,3 * [I] 7,8,14,15; | [XI]CN102893669 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [X] 1,8 * see passages given in english family member EP2858395 * [I] 2-7,9-15; | EP2858395 [ ] (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [ ] * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0107]; figure 6 *; | [A] - HYUNSOOK KIM ET AL, "Enhanced 3GPP system for interworking with fixed broadband access network", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (20130301), vol. 51, no. 3, doi:10.1109/MCOM.2013.6476871, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 88 - 95, XP011497172 [A] 1-15 * page 89; BBF Fixed Line Policy Concept;; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCOM.2013.6476871 | International search | [A]CN101150519 (H3C TECHNOLOGIES CO LTD [CN]); | [X]CN102131240 (ZTE CORP); | [A]CN103001927 (ZTE CORP) |