18.10.2019 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
15.07.2019 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
19.04.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.02.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.06.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.04.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.02.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.07.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.05.2017 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.04.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.02.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.01.2017 |
First examination report |
|
07.10.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
01.07.2016 |
Change - extension states |
published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] |
15.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.03.2016 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 20.04.2016 [2016/16] |
18.03.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.04.2016 [2016/16] |
18.03.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.04.2016 [2016/16] |
01.01.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.02.2016 [2016/05] |
01.01.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.02.2016 [2016/05] |
01.12.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
18.11.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.10.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.10.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.10.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
26.10.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.11.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.11.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|