Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9716719 | Global Dossier | 25.07.2017 | B2 | Priority number | Date | WO2014CN75159 | 11.04.2014 | CN201310155598 | 28.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016065575 | Global Dossier | 03.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014CN75159 | 11.04.2014 | CN201310155598 | 28.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014261983B | Global Dossier | 22.12.2016 | B2 | AU2014261983 | 12.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014CN75159 | 11.04.2014 | CN201310155598 | 28.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2981130 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2016 | A4 | EP2981130 | 03.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014CN75159 | 11.04.2014 | CN201310155598 | 28.04.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014176964 | Global Dossier | 06.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201310155598 | 28.04.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104125569 | Global Dossier | 29.10.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201310155598 | 28.04.2013 |