EP3063357 - SLAT ROOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renson Sunprotection-Screens NV Kalkhoevestraat 45 8790 Waregem / BE | [2016/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN LUCHENE, Frederik Vaartstraat 13 B-9870 Zulte-Machelen / BE | 02 /
ABEEL, Bart Pieter Jules Oudstrijderslaan 4a B-8880 Ledegem / BE | [2016/36] | Representative(s) | Hostens, Veerle, et al KOB NV Patents President Kennedypark 31 C 8500 Kortrijk / BE | [2016/36] | Application number, filing date | 14792609.1 | 29.10.2014 | [2016/36] | WO2014IB65687 | Priority number, date | BE20130000741 | 31.10.2013 Original published format: BE 201300741 | [2016/36] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015063699 | Date: | 07.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3063357 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3063357 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E06B7/086, E06B7/16 | [2016/36] | CPC: |
E04B7/163 (EP,US);
E04F10/08 (US);
E04F10/10 (EP,US);
E06B7/086 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHIEFERDACH | [2016/36] | English: | SLAT ROOF | [2016/36] | French: | TOIT À LAMELLES | [2016/36] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/36] | 08.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.10.2014 | AL | 06.12.2017 | CY | 06.12.2017 | CZ | 06.12.2017 | DK | 06.12.2017 | EE | 06.12.2017 | ES | 06.12.2017 | FI | 06.12.2017 | HR | 06.12.2017 | LT | 06.12.2017 | LV | 06.12.2017 | MC | 06.12.2017 | MK | 06.12.2017 | PL | 06.12.2017 | PT | 06.12.2017 | RO | 06.12.2017 | RS | 06.12.2017 | SE | 06.12.2017 | SI | 06.12.2017 | SK | 06.12.2017 | SM | 06.12.2017 | BG | 06.03.2018 | NO | 06.03.2018 | GR | 07.03.2018 | IS | 06.04.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/32] | HU | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 06.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MK | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IS | 06.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/31] | HU | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 06.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MK | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE20014660U (LACKER HERBERT [DE]) [A] 1-13* page 10, line 29 - page 11, line 30; figures 4-5 *; | [A]EP1992756 (ALLWETTERDACH ESCO GMBH FA [DE]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0042] - [0044]; figures 3-4 *; | [A]EP2159339 (COLT INTERNAT LICENSING LTD [GB]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * | by applicant | DE9110964U | FR2701977 | EP1340863 | EP2159339 | FR2947845 | EP2431547 |