EP3066749 - ELECTRIC MACHINE HAVING A MOUNTING FLANGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.10.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUER, Christian Auf Dem Roetel 23 77886 Lauf / DE | 02 /
KELLER, Thomas Buehlertalstrasse 47 77815 Buehl / DE | [2016/37] | Application number, filing date | 14793058.0 | 24.10.2014 | [2016/37] | WO2014EP72893 | Priority number, date | DE201310222402 | 05.11.2013 Original published format: DE102013222402 | [2016/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015067487 | Date: | 14.05.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3066749 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3066749 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/28, H02K5/26, H02K15/14, B23K101/36, H02K5/00, H02K5/04 | [2017/15] | CPC: |
H02K5/00 (EP,US);
H02K5/04 (EP,CN,US);
H02K5/26 (US);
B23K26/28 (US);
H02K15/14 (US);
B23K2101/36 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/37] | H02K5/04, H02K5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE MASCHINE MIT EINEM BEFESTIGUNGSFLANSCH | [2016/37] | English: | ELECTRIC MACHINE HAVING A MOUNTING FLANGE | [2016/37] | French: | MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE COMPORTANT UNE BRIDE DE FIXATION | [2016/37] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/37] | 07.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 21.02.2018 | CY | 21.02.2018 | DK | 21.02.2018 | EE | 21.02.2018 | FI | 21.02.2018 | HR | 21.02.2018 | LT | 21.02.2018 | LV | 21.02.2018 | MC | 21.02.2018 | MK | 21.02.2018 | MT | 21.02.2018 | NL | 21.02.2018 | PL | 21.02.2018 | PT | 21.02.2018 | RO | 21.02.2018 | RS | 21.02.2018 | SE | 21.02.2018 | SI | 21.02.2018 | SK | 21.02.2018 | SM | 21.02.2018 | TR | 21.02.2018 | BG | 21.05.2018 | NO | 21.05.2018 | GR | 22.05.2018 | IS | 21.06.2018 | IE | 24.10.2018 | LU | 24.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
MK | 21.02.2018 | ||
MT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PT | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
TR | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
IE | 24.10.2018 | ||
LU | 24.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
MT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PT | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
TR | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
IE | 24.10.2018 | ||
LU | 24.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
MT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
TR | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
IE | 24.10.2018 | ||
LU | 24.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
MT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
IE | 24.10.2018 | ||
LU | 24.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
MT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
LU | 24.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
MT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
LU | 24.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
MT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
LU | 24.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
MT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 21.02.2018 | |
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 21.02.2018 | |
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 21.02.2018 | |
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 21.02.2018 | |
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2131473 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-16 * claims 1, 8, 9, 11, 14 ** figures 7, 8 * | by applicant | DE102008002288 |