EP3055211 - LUGGAGE CONTROL AND VERIFICATION SYSTEM AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aumente Aumente, Julio C/Estornell No. 3 Urb. Puig de Ros Llucmajor 07609 Illes Baleares / ES | [2016/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2016/33] | Representative(s) | Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwälte und Solicitor PartG mbB Steinsdorfstraße 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/33] | Schlich, George, et al Schlich 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | Application number, filing date | 14793792.4 | 07.10.2014 | [2016/33] | WO2014EP71408 | Priority number, date | ES20130031478 | 08.10.2013 Original published format: ES 201331478 | US201461990652P | 08.05.2014 Original published format: US 201461990652 P | [2016/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015052165 | Date: | 16.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3055211 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B64F1/36 | [2016/33] | CPC: |
B64F1/366 (EP,US);
G01G19/52 (ES,US);
G01G23/365 (ES);
G06Q10/08 (ES);
G07B15/00 (US);
Y02T50/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/33] | Title | German: | GEPÄCKKONTROLL- UND -PRÜFSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG | [2016/33] | English: | LUGGAGE CONTROL AND VERIFICATION SYSTEM AND METHODS OF USE | [2016/33] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CONTRÔLE ET DE VÉRIFICATION DE BAGAGES ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2016/33] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/33] | 01.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/41] | 29.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2012012841 (QANTAS AIRWAYS LTD [AU], et al); | [X]WO2012130876 (SIEMENS SA [ES], et al) |