EP2994317 - NANOSTRUCTURE ARRAY DIFFRACTIVE OPTICS FOR RGB COLOR DISPLAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/11] | NANOSTRUCTURE ARRAY DIFFRACTIVE OPTICS FOR RGB AND CMYK COLOR DISPLAYS | ||
[2019/20] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Revocation of patent | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NANOTECH SECURITY CORP. 505 - 3292 Production Way Burnaby, British Columbia V5A 4R4 / CA | [2020/16] |
Former [2016/11] | For all designated states Idit Technologies Corp. 308-2999 Underhill Avenue Burnaby, British Columbia V5A 3C2 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANDROCK, Clinton K. 1412 Hope Rd. North Vancouver, British Columbia V7P 1W8 / CA | 02 /
OMRANE, Badr 1006-7376 Halifax St. Burnaby, British Columbia V5A 1M5 / CA | 03 /
CHUO, Yindar 305-4118 Dawson St. Burnaby, British Columbia V5C 0A3 / CA | [2016/11] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2019/46] | Bryers LLP 7 Gay Street Bath, Bath and North East Somerset BA1 2PH / GB | ||
Former [2016/11] | chapman + co Senghennydd Road Cardiff, South Wales CF24 4AY / GB | Application number, filing date | 14794849.1 | 12.05.2014 | [2016/11] | WO2014CA50444 | Priority number, date | US201361822166P | 10.05.2013 Original published format: US 201361822166 P | [2016/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014179892 | Date: | 13.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2994317 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2994317 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 13.11.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B42D25/30, B42D25/328, G07D7/12, G02B5/18 | [2017/19] | CPC: |
B42D25/328 (EP,US);
B42D25/30 (EP,US);
G02B5/18 (US);
G02B5/1809 (EP,US);
G02B5/1842 (EP,US);
G02B5/1852 (US);
G02B5/1857 (US);
G02B5/201 (EP,US);
G02B5/203 (EP,US);
H01J37/3174 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/11] | B42D25/30, B42D25/328, G07D7/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIFFRAKTIVE ARRAY-NANOSTRUKTUROPTIK FÜR RGB-FARBANZEIGEN | [2019/20] | English: | NANOSTRUCTURE ARRAY DIFFRACTIVE OPTICS FOR RGB COLOR DISPLAYS | [2019/20] | French: | ÉLÉMENTS OPTIQUES DE DIFFRACTION À RÉSEAUX DE NANOSTRUCTURES POUR AFFICHAGES COULEUR RVB | [2019/20] |
Former [2016/11] | DIFFRAKTIVE ARRAY-NANOSTRUKTUROPTIK FÜR RGB- UND CMYK-FARBANZEIGEN | ||
Former [2016/11] | NANOSTRUCTURE ARRAY DIFFRACTIVE OPTICS FOR RGB AND CMYK COLOR DISPLAYS | ||
Former [2016/11] | ÉLÉMENTS OPTIQUES DE DIFFRACTION À RÉSEAUX DE NANOSTRUCTURES POUR AFFICHAGES COULEUR RVB ET CMJN | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 09.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/11] | 10.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 02.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.08.2020
14.08.2020
ADMISSIBLE DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED De La Rue House, Jays Close, Viables Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4BS / GB Opponent's representative Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2021/35] |
Former [2020/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.08.2020
DE LA RUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED De La Rue House, Jays Close, Viables Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4BS / GB Opponent's representative Gill Jennings & Every LLP HJS The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | 25.08.2020 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.12.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.02.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.02.2023 | 15.02.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.04.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.04.2024 | 17.04.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 29.04.2024 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2024/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.05.2014 | AL | 13.11.2019 | AT | 13.11.2019 | CY | 13.11.2019 | CZ | 13.11.2019 | DK | 13.11.2019 | EE | 13.11.2019 | FI | 13.11.2019 | HR | 13.11.2019 | IT | 13.11.2019 | LT | 13.11.2019 | LV | 13.11.2019 | MC | 13.11.2019 | MK | 13.11.2019 | MT | 13.11.2019 | NL | 13.11.2019 | PL | 13.11.2019 | RO | 13.11.2019 | RS | 13.11.2019 | SE | 13.11.2019 | SI | 13.11.2019 | SK | 13.11.2019 | SM | 13.11.2019 | TR | 13.11.2019 | BG | 13.02.2020 | NO | 13.02.2020 | GR | 14.02.2020 | IS | 13.03.2020 | PT | 13.03.2020 | IE | 12.05.2020 | LU | 12.05.2020 | BE | 31.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 12.05.2014 | |
AL | 13.11.2019 | ||
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CY | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
MT | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
TR | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
IE | 12.05.2020 | ||
LU | 12.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
IE | 12.05.2020 | ||
LU | 12.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
IE | 12.05.2020 | ||
LU | 12.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
LU | 12.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 13.11.2019 | |
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 13.11.2019 | |
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 13.11.2019 | |
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 13.11.2019 | |
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 13.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CN101306615 (TRAFFIC MAN RES INST MINISTRY [CN]) [X] 1-11 * the whole document * [I] 12-15; | [XIA]EP2336810 (BOEGLI GRAVURES SA [CH]) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0026] , [0 38] * [I] 12[A] 13-15 | International search | [A]WO2005052650 (NANOVENTIONS INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2009090091 (OVD KINEGRAM AG [CH], et al); | [A]EP2228672 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP2447744 (SUISSE ELECTRONIQUE MICROTECH [CH]) | Opposition | WO2011072408 | US7989254 | WO2011139785 | EP2447744 | WO2012156049 | WO2013039454 | WO2014023415 |