EP2995366 - DEVICE FOR SEPARATING CARBON DIOXIDE USING SILICONE SEPARATION FILM AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.01.2020 [2020/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARSTROMA Co., Ltd. 801 Software venture tower 117, Dongbuk-ro Buk-gu Daegu / KR | [2016/22] |
Former [2016/11] | For all designated states Kim, Gwan Shig 2868-12 Haean-ro Songna-myeon Buk-gu Pohang si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 791-863 / KR | ||
For all designated states Shin, Ki Yeong 225-501 71 Sinmae-ro Suseong-gu Daegu 706-750 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Gwan Shig 2868-12 Haean-ro Songna-myeon Buk-gu Pohang si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 791-863 / KR | 02 /
SHIN, Ki Yeong 225-501 71 Sinmae-ro Suseong-gu Daegu 706-750 / KR | [2016/22] |
Former [2016/11] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/11] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 14794902.8 | 29.04.2014 | [2016/11] | WO2014KR03757 | Priority number, date | KR20130053058 | 10.05.2013 Original published format: KR 20130053058 | KR20130119091 | 07.10.2013 Original published format: KR 20130119091 | [2016/11] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014181994 | Date: | 13.11.2014 | Language: | KO | [2014/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2995366 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.11.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/22 | [2016/11] | CPC: |
B01D53/228 (EP,US);
B01D53/22 (RU);
B01D53/225 (US);
B01D69/12 (EP,RU,US);
B01D71/70 (EP,RU,US);
B01D2053/221 (US);
B01D2053/223 (EP,US);
B01D2256/245 (US);
B01D2257/504 (EP,US);
B01D2258/0283 (EP,US);
B01D2259/80 (EP,US);
B01D2259/816 (EP,US);
Y02C20/40 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/11] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ABSCHEIDUNG VON KOHLENDIOXID UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER SILIKONTRENNFOLIE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2016/11] | English: | DEVICE FOR SEPARATING CARBON DIOXIDE USING SILICONE SEPARATION FILM AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2016/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LA SEPARATION DE DIOXYDE DE CARBONE UTILISANT UN FILM DE SEPARATION EN SILICONE ET PROCEDE POUR SA FABRICATION | [2016/11] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2015 | Translation filed | 09.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2015 | Search fee paid | 09.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/11] | 03.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/02] | 03.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4737165 (KULPRATHIPANJA SANTI [US], et al); | [A]GB2277885 (WAKEMAN RICHARD JOHN [GB], et al); | [A]US2002056371 (HAYES WARREN [US]); | [Y]US7344585 (KULPRATHIPANJA SANTI [US], et al); | [A]US2008173179 (TANDON KUNJ [IN], et al); | [Y]KR101059830B (COA 21 CO LTD [KR]); | [A]WO2012006155 (ECO TECHNOL PTY LTD [AU], et al); | [Y]WO2012138755 (AHN DONGCHAN [US], et al); | [Y]WO2012170541 (AHN DONGCHAN [US], et al) | International search | [A]JPH10249175 (KYOCERA CORP); | [A]JP2000279773 (KYOCERA CORP); | [A]JP3501951B ; | [A]US7938894 (OYAMA SHIGEO TED [US], et al); | [A]KR101059830B (COA 21 CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2012279922 (HAENSEL RENE [DE], et al); | by applicant | JPH10180062 | KR100734926B |