EP3006571 - HLA GENE MULTIPLEX DNA TYPING METHOD AND KIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genodive Pharma Inc. 1-19-35 Ryokuen Izumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 245-0002 / JP | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIINA, Takashi 5-7-7-501 Kawaraguchi Ebina-shi Kanagawa 243-0433 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Shingo 1-18-21-202 Tsumadaminami Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0814 / JP | 03 /
WADA, Yuki 2-1-1-603 Asahi-cho Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0014 / JP | 04 /
MITSUNAGA, Shigeki 2824-1-A308 Nara-cho Aoba-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 227-0036 / JP | 05 /
INOKO, Hidetoshi 1-19-35 Ryokuen Izumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 245-0002 / JP | [2016/16] |
Former [2016/15] | 01 /
SHIINA, Takashi 5-7-7-501 Kawaraguchi Ebina-shi Kanagawa 243-0433 / JP | ||
02 /
SUZUKI, Shingo 5-42-36-407 Asahi-cho Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0014 / JP | |||
03 /
WADA, Yuki 2-1-1-603 Asahi-cho Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0014 / JP | |||
04 /
MITSUNAGA, Shigeki 2824-1-A308 Nara-cho Aoba-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 227-0036 / JP | |||
05 /
INOKO, Hidetoshi 1-19-35 Ryokuen Izumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 245-0002 / JP | Representative(s) | Docherty, Robert Charles Symbiosis IP Limited York Biotech Campus Office 14FA05 Sand Hutton York, YO41 1LZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/33] | Docherty, Robert Charles Symbiosis IP Limited NAFIC Office 14FA05 Sand Hutton York, North Yorkshire YO41 1LZ / GB | ||
Former [2016/15] | Docherty, Robert Charles Symbiosis IP Limited 106 Heworth Green York YO31 7TQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14795192.5 | 09.05.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014JP62433 | Priority number, date | JP20130099547 | 09.05.2013 Original published format: JP 2013099547 | [2016/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014181854 | Date: | 13.11.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3006571 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3006571 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.11.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6881 | [2018/11] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6881 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/16 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/15] | C12Q1/68, C12N15/09 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND KIT FÜR MULTIPLEX-DNA-TYPISIERUNG VON HLA-GENEN | [2016/15] | English: | HLA GENE MULTIPLEX DNA TYPING METHOD AND KIT | [2016/15] | French: | MÉTHODE ET KIT DE TYPAGE MULTIPLEX DE L'ADN DU GÈNE HLA | [2016/15] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2015 | Translation filed | 01.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 01.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 11.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2017 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001 | 03.10.2017 | Request for decision received: Priority | 25.10.2017 | Result of request for decision (Priority): Request accepted | 07.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/30] | Request for further processing for: | 03.10.2017 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.05.2014 | AL | 15.08.2018 | AT | 15.08.2018 | CY | 15.08.2018 | CZ | 15.08.2018 | DK | 15.08.2018 | EE | 15.08.2018 | ES | 15.08.2018 | FI | 15.08.2018 | HR | 15.08.2018 | IT | 15.08.2018 | LT | 15.08.2018 | LV | 15.08.2018 | MC | 15.08.2018 | MK | 15.08.2018 | MT | 15.08.2018 | NL | 15.08.2018 | PL | 15.08.2018 | RO | 15.08.2018 | RS | 15.08.2018 | SE | 15.08.2018 | SI | 15.08.2018 | SK | 15.08.2018 | SM | 15.08.2018 | TR | 15.08.2018 | BG | 15.11.2018 | NO | 15.11.2018 | GR | 16.11.2018 | IS | 15.12.2018 | PT | 15.12.2018 | IE | 09.05.2019 | LU | 09.05.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 09.05.2014 | |
AL | 15.08.2018 | ||
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CY | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
MT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
PT | 15.12.2018 | ||
IE | 09.05.2019 | ||
LU | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 09.05.2014 | |
AL | 15.08.2018 | ||
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CY | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
PT | 15.12.2018 | ||
IE | 09.05.2019 | ||
LU | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CY | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
PT | 15.12.2018 | ||
IE | 09.05.2019 | ||
LU | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
PT | 15.12.2018 | ||
IE | 09.05.2019 | ||
LU | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
IE | 09.05.2019 | ||
LU | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
LU | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
LU | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 15.08.2018 | |
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 15.08.2018 | |
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 15.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9215711 (UNIV MINNESOTA [US]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * * page 27, line 22 - line 25 * [I] 3-5; | [XA]EP0953650 (INNOGENETICS NV [BE]) [X] 6,7 * the whole document * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0009] * [A] 4; | [XI]US2007065860 (HILDEBRAND WILLIAM H [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0026] * * abstract * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0037] * [I] 3-5; | [XA]JP2009261358 (IGAKU SEIBUTSUGAKU KENKYUSHO K) [X] 6,7 * the whole document * [A] 4; | [A]WO2011030159 (KING S COLLEGE LONDON [GB], et al) [A] 1-7 * p.9, paragraphs 1-5 * * paragraph bridging p.18-19 * * p.32, paragraphs 3-4 * * examples 1-2; tables 1-2 * * claims 1, 4-12, 23-24, 29-30 * * p.5, paragraph 3-p.6, paragraph 2 *; | [A]WO2012000445 (BGI SHENZHEN CO LTD [CN], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO2013011734 (GENODIVE PHARMA INC [JP], et al) [AD] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [T]EP2599877 (BGI SHENZHEN CO LTD [CN]) [T] * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0082] * * abstract * * paragraph [0014] *; | [XPI]WO2014065410 (GENODIVE PHARMA INC [JP]) [XP] 1,2,5 * page 7; table 1 * [I] 3,4,6,7; | [T]EP2735617 (GENODIVE PHARMA INC [JP]) [T] * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0016] * * [0042], [0079], [0103], [0139];; tables 1-4 * * figures 4, 7, 8 * * paragraph [0143] - paragraph [0144] * * claims 1-35 *; | [E]WO2015047220 (UNIV GEORGETOWN [US]) [E] 1,2,5 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2015080226 (GENODIVE PHARMA INC [JP]) [E] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [T]EP3075863 (GENODIVE PHARMA INC [JP]) [T] * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0018]; examples 2-3 * * claims 1-7 *; | [ ] - Anonymous, "EM_PAT:A93974", (19991103), URL: http://ibis.internal.epo.org/exam/dbfetch.jsp?id=EM_PAT:A93974, (20161216), XP055329787 [ ] * abstract * | [ ] - Anonymous, "EM_PAT:FU756955", (20091112), URL: http://ibis.internal.epo.org/exam/dbfetch.jsp?id=EM_PAT:FU756955, (20161216), XP055329777 [ ] * abstract * | [P] - "WO 2015080226-A/8: Method and Kit for DNA typing of HLA genes using massive parallel sequencer.", EMBL, (20151110), Database accession no. HZ080360, URL: EBI, XP002765313 [P] * abstract * | [ ] - Anonymous, "EM_PAT:HZ080360", (20150604), URL: http://ibis.internal.epo.org/exam/dbfetch.jsp?id=EM_PAT:HZ080360, (20161216), XP055329918 | [A] - BENTLEY G ET AL, "High-resolution, high-throughput HLA genotyping by next-generation sequencing", TISSUE ANTIGENS, (20091101), vol. 74, no. 5, doi:10.1111/j.1399-0039.2009.01345.x, ISSN 0001-2815, pages 393 - 403, XP055087325 [A] 1-7 * abstract * * page 395, column 1, paragraph 4 - column 2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1399-0039.2009.01345.x | [A] - HOLCOMB C L ET AL, "A multi-site study using high-resolution HLA genotyping by next generation sequencing", TISSUE ANTIGENS., DK, (20110308), vol. 77, no. 3, doi:10.1111/j.1399-0039.2010.01606.x, ISSN 0001-2815, pages 206 - 217, XP055329817 [A] 1-7 * abstract * * page 207, column 1, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1399-0039.2010.01606.x | [T] - OZAKI Y ET AL, "Cost-efficient multiplex PCR for routine genotyping of up to nine classical HLA loci in a single analytical run of multiple samples by next generation sequencing", BMC GENOMICS, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD, LONDON, UK, (20150418), vol. 16, no. 1, doi:10.1186/S12864-015-1514-4, ISSN 1471-2164, page 318, XP021216791 [T] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s12864-015-1514-4 | International search | [A]WO0061795 (INNOGENETICS NV [BE], et al); | [A]WO2005042764 (DYNAL BIOTECH LLC [US], et al); | [Y] - SHINGO SUZUKI ET AL., "Jisedai Sequencer o Mochiita HLA Class I Idenshi no Cho Kokaizodo DNA Typing (Super high resolution Single molecule-Sequence Based Typing; SS-SBT) Ho no Kaihatsu", MHC, (2012), vol. 19, no. 1, pages 43 - 53, XP008182619 | [Y] - YUKI OZAKI ET AL., "Jisedai Sequencer o Mochiita HLA-DRB1 Idenshi no Cho Kokaizodo DNA Typing (Super high resolution Single molecule- Sequence Based Typing; SS-SBT) Ho no Kaihatsu", MHC, (2012), vol. 19, no. 2, pages 211 - 221, XP008182343 | [A] - MOONSAMY P.V. ET AL., "HIGH THROUGHPUT HLA GENOTYPING USING 454 SEQUENCING AND THE FLUIDIGM ACCESS ARRAY SYSTEM FOR SIMPLIFIED AMPLICON LIBRARY PREPARATION", TISSUE ANTIGENS, (201303), vol. 81, no. 3, pages 141 - 149, XP055127659 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/tan.12071 | by applicant | JPH0216000 | WO2013011734 | - LIND C. ET AL., HUMAN IMMUNOLOGY, (2010), vol. 71, pages 1033 - 1042 | - SHIINA T. ET AL., TISSUE ANTIGENS, (2012), vol. 80, pages 305 - 316 | - HIDETOSHI INOKO; TAKEHIKO SASAZUKI; TAKEO JUUJI, Transplantation/transfusion Examination, KODAN-SHA SCIENTIFIC, (2004), page 48 | - HIDETOSHI INOKO; TAKEHIKO SASAZUKI; TAKEO JUUJI, Transplantation/transfusion Examination, KODAN-SHA SCIENTIFIC, (2004), page 35 | - HIDETOSHI INOKO; TAKEHIKO SASAZUKI; TAKEO JUUJI, Transplantation/transfusion Examination, KODAN-SHA SCIENTIFIC, (2004), page 46,47 | - Experimental Medicine, YODO-SHA, (2009), vol. 27 |